blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3332552 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680034247 EP16819781



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017164007Global Dossier 08.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201562264135 07.12.2015
US201615370840 06.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108605145Global Dossier 28.09.2018A
Priority number Date
US201562264135 07.12.2015
WO2016US65382 07.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3332552Global Dossier 13.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201562264135 07.12.2015
WO2016US65382 07.12.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017100323Global Dossier 15.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201562264135 07.12.2015