Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3332552

EP3332552 - MIXED BOOLEAN-TOKEN ANS COEFFICIENT CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2018/24]
Inventor(s)01 / CONVERSE, Alexander Jay
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
 [2018/24]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[2018/24]
Application number, filing date16819781.207.12.2016
[2018/24]
WO2016US65382
Priority number, dateUS201562264135P07.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562264135 P
[2018/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017100323
Date:15.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3332552
Date:13.06.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017
[2018/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/91, H04N19/13, H04N19/169
[2018/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/24]
TitleGerman:GEMISCHTE CODIERUNG BOOLESCHER TOKEN-ANS-KOEFFIZIENTEN[2018/24]
English:MIXED BOOLEAN-TOKEN ANS COEFFICIENT CODING[2018/24]
French:CODAGE MIXTE DE COEFFICIENTS ANS DE JETON BOOLÉEN[2018/24]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2018National basic fee paid 
27.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.2017Observations by third parties
27.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/24]
27.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/12]
02.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2019/12]
02.11.2018Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[ID]  - Jarek Duda, "Asymmetric numeral systems: entropy coding combining speed of Huffman coding with compression rate of arithmetic coding", (20131111), pages 1 - 24, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1311.2540.pdf, (20170228), XP055350053 [ID] 1-21 * section 3 *
 [I]  - FABIAN GIESEN, "Interleaved entropy coders", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20140214), XP080005632 [I] 1-21 * abstract * * sections 2-3 *
 [IP]  - Duda J; Converse A, "Re: New entropy coding: faster than Huffman, compression rate like arithmetic", Google group: Codec developers, (20151229), URL: https://groups.google.com/a/webmproject.org/forum/#!topic/codec-devel/idezdUoV1yY, (20170224), XP055349420 [IP] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [I]  - JAREK DUDA, "Asymmetric numeral systems", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20090202), XP080308877 [I] 1-21 * abstract * * section 4 *
 [A]  - MUKHERJEE, D, "An overview of new video coding tools in VP10", FUTURE VIDEO CODING WORKSHOP 3, (20151121), XP030001654 [A] 1-21 * page 27 *