Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3157322

EP3157322 - MODULAR SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING CROP YIELDS WITH HIGH RESOLUTION GEO-REFERENCED SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agerpoint, Inc.
P.O. Box 1195
New Smyrna Beach, Florida 32168 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/17]For all designated states
Agerpoint, Inc.
240 S. Palmetto Avenue
Daytona Beach, Florida 32114 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MCPEEK, K., Thomas
424 E. Central Blvd. 124
Orlando, Florida 32801 / US
 [2017/17]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/17]Trueman, Lucy Petra
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date16819787.913.07.2016
[2017/17]
WO2016US42161
Priority number, dateUS201562192031P13.07.2015         Original published format: US 201562192031 P
[2017/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017011595
Date:19.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3157322
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017
[2017/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01G22/00, A01B79/00
[2019/42]
Former International [2017/34]A01M7/00, A01G1/00, G01N33/00, G06K9/00
Former International [2017/17]A01G1/00, G01N33/00, G06K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
TitleGerman:MODULARE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ERNTELEISTUNG MIT HOCHER AUFLÖSENDEN GEOREFERENZIERTEN SENSOREN[2019/45]
English:MODULAR SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING CROP YIELDS WITH HIGH RESOLUTION GEO-REFERENCED SENSORS[2017/17]
French:SYSTÈMES MODULAIRES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTERMINATION DE RENDEMENTS DE CULTURES AVEC DES CAPTEURS GÉO-RÉFÉRENCÉS HAUTE RÉSOLUTION[2017/17]
Former [2017/17]MODULARE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ERNTELEISTUNG MIT HOHER AUFLÖSENDEN GEOREFERENZIERTEN SENSOREN
Entry into regional phase11.01.2017National basic fee paid 
11.01.2017Search fee paid 
11.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/17]
11.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2014052712  (AGCO CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 12 - page 3, paragraph 13 * * page 10, paragraph 29 - page 11, paragraph 30 * * page 12, paragraph 33 * * page 14, paragraph 37 *
International search[A]US2013325346  (MCPEEK K THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-21 * entire document *;
 [A]US2004136139  (KUMMEL KNUT [DE]) [A] 1-21 * entire document *;
 [A]US2013124239  (ROSA URIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * entire document *;
 [A]  - CHIANG et al., "The performance analysis of a real-time integrated INS/GPS vehicle navigation system with abnormal GPS measurement elimination.", Sensors, (20130815), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Kai-Wei-Chiang/publication/255975937-The Performan ce_Analysis_of_a_Real-Time_Integrated_INSGPS_Vehicle_Navigation_System_with_Abnormal _GPS_Measurement_Elimination/links/568d289308aec2fdf6f6dffe.pdf, XP055346220 [A] 1-21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s130810599
 [A]  - ZHANG et al., "Mapping orchards for autonomous navigation.", American Society of Agricultural and Biological Engineers., (20140716), URL: https://www.ri.cmu.edulpub_files/2014/7/ASABE_2014.pdf, XP055346224 [A] 1-21