Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472724

EP3472724 - GENERATING CONTEXTUAL SEARCH SUGGESTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
30.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / AGGARWAL, Vikram
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View California 94043 / US
02 / RAMCHANDRAN, Aparna Rajan
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View California 94043 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Varley, James Richard , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16820081.408.12.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016US65609
Priority number, dateUS20161519415327.06.2016         Original published format: US201615194153
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018004729
Date:04.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472724
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG VON KONTEXTABHÄNGIGEN SUCHVORSCHLÄGEN[2019/17]
English:GENERATING CONTEXTUAL SEARCH SUGGESTIONS[2019/17]
French:GÉNÉRATION DE SUGGESTIONS DE RECHERCHE CONTEXTUELLE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
16.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012016678  (GRUBER THOMAS ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0476] * * paragraph [0449] - paragraph [0584] * * paragraph [0645] - paragraph [0686] * [I] 8-11;
 [XI]US2014040748  (LEMAY STEPHEN O [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0368] * * figures 11-26b * [I] 8-11;
 [IA]US2014032529  (CHANG WALTER [US]) [I] 1-6,8-18,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0066] * [A] 7,19;
 [IA]US2013173604  (LI KANG [US], et al) [I] 1-6,8-18,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0038] * [A] 7,19;
 [A]  - Brett Kelly, "How Evernote's Image Recognition Works | Evernote Tech Blog", (20131112), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20131112112627/http://blog.evernote.com/tech/2013/07/18/how-evernotes-image-recognition-works/, (20150323), XP055178289 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * the whole document *