Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3397118

EP3397118 - SLEEPING OR RECLINING FURNITURE AND ELECTRIC MOTOR FURNITURE DRIVE FOR SUCH FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/45]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GEHRKE, Karsten
Immengarten 4
32457 Porta Westfalica / DE
02 / HILLE, Armin
Neuer Brink 10
33659 Bielefeld / DE
03 / LOLEY, Steffen
Neelmeyerstraße 33
49082 Osnabrück / DE
04 / TEWS, Alexander
Mühlenstr. 71
33607 Bielefeld / DE
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/45]
Application number, filing date16820311.530.12.2016
[2018/45]
WO2016EP82911
Priority number, dateDE201520107148U30.12.2015         Original published format: DE 202015107148 U
DE20161010952424.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016109524
DE201620103605U06.07.2016         Original published format: DE 202016103605 U
[2018/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017114945
Date:06.07.2017
Language:DE
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3397118
Date:07.11.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017
[2018/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04, A47C31/00, A61B5/00
[2018/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
TitleGerman:SCHLAF- ODER RUHEMÖBEL UND ELEKTROMOTORISCHER MÖBELANTRIEB FÜR EIN SOLCHES MÖBEL[2018/45]
English:SLEEPING OR RECLINING FURNITURE AND ELECTRIC MOTOR FURNITURE DRIVE FOR SUCH FURNITURE[2018/45]
French:MEUBLE DE COUCHAGE OU DE REPOS ET ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MEUBLE À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR LEDIT MEUBLE[2018/45]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2018National basic fee paid 
09.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
09.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2013173640  (RAWLS-MEEHAN MARTIN [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-13,16-20 * paragraph [0429] - paragraph [0432]; figures 1,6,36-38 * [I] 3,5,14,15;
 [XI]JP2005177471  (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1,4,5,7-10,16-20 * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0278]; figures 1-15 * [I] 3,6,11;
 [XI]JP2005253957  (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1,4,5,7-10,14-20 * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0205]; figures 1-15 * [I] 3,6;
 [XI]US2010101022  (RILEY CARL WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-20 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0094]; figures 1-19 * [I] 10,11,15;
 [XI]US2014266733  (HAYES MICHAEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,12-14,16-20 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0160]; figures 1-19 * [I] 3,11,15