Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3320677

EP3320677 - CAPTURING SOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
10.01.2020First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2018/20]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / VILERMO, Miikka
Selmankuja 5
37200 Siuro / FI
02 / LAITINEN, Mikko-Ville
Melkonkatu 9 A 6
00210 Helsinki / FI
03 / OZCAN, Koray
23 Church Road West
Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6QF / GB
 [2018/20]
Representative(s)Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
21a John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/20]Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date16820897.305.07.2016
[2018/20]
WO2016FI50493
Priority number, dateGB2015001194908.07.2015         Original published format: GB 201511949
GB2015001319827.07.2015         Original published format: GB 201513198
[2018/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017005977
Date:12.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3320677
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI12.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225, H04R1/40, H04S7/00, H04R1/00, H04R3/00, H04R5/027
[2019/04]
Former International [2018/20]H04N5/225, H04R1/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
TitleGerman:ERFASSEN VON SCHALL[2018/20]
English:CAPTURING SOUND[2018/20]
French:CAPTURE DE SON[2018/20]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2018National basic fee paid 
15.01.2018Search fee paid 
15.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/20]
15.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1377041  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, paragraph 14 * * column 10, paragraph 37 - column 12, paragraph 44 * * column 13, paragraph 49 - column 13, paragraph 58 * * column 15, paragraph 60 - column 15, paragraph 61 * * figures 3A-4 *;
 [XA]WO2010125228  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,11,15 * page 5, line 26 - page 8, line 26 * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1-23 * [A] 2-10,12-14
International search[X]US2011222372  (O'DONOVAN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 10, 13-25 * abstract; paragraphs [0063], [0064], [0065], [0072]; figs 2A *;
 [A]EP1377041  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract; fig 3B *;
 [A]WO2015076149  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2840807  (OTICON AS [DK]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2014114364  (ABB TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract *;
 [A]US2013147835  (LEE JONG HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract *