EP3321137 - BUMPER REINFORCEMENT AND VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/36] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGA, Atsuo c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZAWA, Yoshiaki c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/20] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16821394.0 | 05.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016JP69858 | Priority number, date | JP20150137098 | 08.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015137098 | [2018/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017006925 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321137 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3321137 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/04 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
B60R19/18 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B60R19/04 (KR,RU,US);
B60R19/023 (EP);
B60R2019/1813 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSFÄNGERVERSTÄRKUNG UND FAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2018/20] | English: | BUMPER REINFORCEMENT AND VEHICLE PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2018/20] | French: | RENFORT DE PARE-CHOCS ET VÉHICULE LE COMPORTANT | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2017 | Translation filed | 11.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 11.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2016 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | IT | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | IE | 05.07.2020 | LU | 05.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | GB | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.07.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GB | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GB | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
IE | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5154462 (CARPENTER RONALD A [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 59 - line 68; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4413641 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9811267 (BENSON PETER [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO2014142733 (GESTAMP HARDTECH AB [SE]) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO2014146922 (KIRCHHOFF AUTOMOTIVE D GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE102013015420 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2003020291 (ROUSSEL THIERRY [FR], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0047] to [0058]; fig. 6 & EP 1277622 A1 & DE 60225091 T2 & FR 2827235 A1 & ES 2300425 T3 *; | [Y]JP2007521173 (Gestamp Hardtech AB.) [Y] 1-5 * , fig. 3 & US 2007/0102942 A1 & WO 2005/054011 A1 & EP 1730002 A1 & AU 2003289688 A1 *; | [Y]US2015102614 (ARNS WILHELM [DE]) [Y] 1-5* , fig. 4 & DE 102013111189 A1 & CN 104554099 A * |