Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3232649

EP3232649 - FLEXIBLE SCREEN MOBILE TERMINAL CAPABLE OF SLIDING SEPARABLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018Change: Validation statespublished on 17.10.2018  [2018/42]
14.09.2018Change - extension statespublished on 17.10.2018  [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guangdong Oppo Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Yugui
Ding, Ke
No.18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an District
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date16823712.112.05.2016
[2017/42]
WO2016CN81856
Priority number, dateCN20151040856313.07.2015         Original published format: CN201510408563
[2017/42]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017008565
Date:19.01.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3232649
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/02, G06F1/16
[2018/32]
Former International [2017/42]H04M1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:MOBILES ENDGERÄT MIT FLEXIBLEM BILDSCHIRM MIT FÄHIGKEIT FÜR SEPARATES GLEITEN[2017/42]
English:FLEXIBLE SCREEN MOBILE TERMINAL CAPABLE OF SLIDING SEPARABLY[2017/42]
French:TERMINAL MOBILE À ÉCRAN SOUPLE POUVANT COULISSER SÉPARÉMENT[2017/42]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2017Translation filed 
11.07.2017National basic fee paid 
11.07.2017Search fee paid 
11.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
11.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[PX]CN104980545  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [PX] 1-20 * , claims 1-10, and description, paragraphs [0037]-[0071] *;
 [PX]CN204733213U  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [PX] 1-20 * , claims 1-10, and description, paragraphs [0037]-[0071] *;
 [A]CN103927940  (PREXCO CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , description, paragraphs [0051]-[0074], and figure 1 *;
 [A]CN104537955  (SHANGHAI MORUAN COMM TECH CO) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN103941816  (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2014196253  (SONG IN-SUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *