blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3300057

EP3300057 - USE OF A SIMULATED ANIMAL ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/13]SIMULATED ANIMAL ORGAN PRODUCING METHOD AND SIMULATED ANIMAL ORGAN
[2019/43]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOTOBUKI Medical Inc.
190-2 Ukizuka
Yashio-shi, Saitama 340-0835 / JP
[2020/13]
Former [2018/13]For all designated states
Kotobuki Giken Inc.
190-2 Ukizuka
Yashio-shi, Saitama 340-0835 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAYAMA Seiichiro
c/o Kotobuki Giken Inc.
190-2 Ukizuka
Yashio-shi Saitama 340-0835 / JP
 [2018/13]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2018/13]
Application number, filing date16824170.106.06.2016
[2018/13]
WO2016JP66731
Priority number, dateJP2015013838110.07.2015         Original published format: JP 2015138381
[2018/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017010190
Date:19.01.2017
Language:JA
[2017/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3300057
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3300057
Date:25.03.2020
Language:EN
[2020/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:B29C39/10, B29C39/14, B29C39/38, G09B23/30, // B29L31/00
[2019/43]
CPC:
G09B23/30 (EP,US); B29C39/10 (EP,US); B29C39/142 (EP);
B29C39/38 (EP,US); G09B9/00 (US); B29K2005/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7532 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/29]B29C39/38, G09B23/30
Former IPC [2018/13]G09B23/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES SIMULIERTEN TIERORGANS[2019/43]
English:USE OF A SIMULATED ANIMAL ORGAN[2019/43]
French:UTILISATION D'UN ORGANE ANIMAL SIMULÉ[2019/43]
Former [2018/13]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SIMULIERTEN TIERORGANS UND SIMULIERTES TIERORGAN
Former [2018/13]SIMULATED ANIMAL ORGAN PRODUCING METHOD AND SIMULATED ANIMAL ORGAN
Former [2018/13]PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ORGANE ANIMAL SIMULÉ, ET ORGANE ANIMAL SIMULÉ
Entry into regional phase20.12.2017Translation filed 
20.12.2017National basic fee paid 
20.12.2017Search fee paid 
20.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/13]
20.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2020Fee for grant paid
13.02.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.02.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.01.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2016
AL25.03.2020
AT25.03.2020
CY25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
MK25.03.2020
MT25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
TR25.03.2020
IE06.06.2020
LU06.06.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
[2022/31]
Former [2022/30]HU06.06.2016
AL25.03.2020
AT25.03.2020
CY25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
MT25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
TR25.03.2020
IE06.06.2020
LU06.06.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2022/27]HU06.06.2016
AT25.03.2020
CY25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
MT25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
TR25.03.2020
IE06.06.2020
LU06.06.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/24]AT25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
IE06.06.2020
LU06.06.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/20]AT25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
IE06.06.2020
LU06.06.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/15]AT25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
LU06.06.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/10]AT25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/09]AT25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/08]CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/50]CZ25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/49]CZ25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/48]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/47]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
Former [2020/46]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
Former [2020/45]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
Former [2020/39]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
Former [2020/38]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
Former [2020/37]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
NO25.06.2020
Former [2020/35]FI25.03.2020
NO25.06.2020
Documents cited:Search[YA]JPH0411853  (SUGYO KK) [Y] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 6;
 [XAYI]JP2002360572  (KAWASUMI LAB INC) [X] 16,19,21 * claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0014] * [A] 6,18 [Y] 1-5,7-15 [I] 17,20;
 [A]EP2011450  (SHOFU KK [JP]) [A] 1-21* paragraphs [0172] - [0174]; table 12 *;
 [XAI]JP2013015789  (HOSODA SHC KK, et al) [X] 16,19-21 * paragraph [§0070]; example 5 * [A] 1-15,18 [I] 17;
 [YA]US2014162016  (MATSUI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 13,14 * paragraphs [0146] - [0161] * * claims 1-19 * [A] 1-12,15-21;
 [YA]  - MARTIN A. K. WILLIAMS ET AL, "A Molecular Description of the Gelation Mechanism of Konjac Mannan", BIOMACROMOLECULES, US, (20000901), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1021/bm005525y, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 440 - 450, XP055476916 [Y] 1-5,7-15 * see the introduction; page 440 * [A] 6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm005525y
International search[Y]JPH0226567  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * , page 1, lower right column, lines 10 to 13; page 3, upper left column, line 14 to lower left column, line 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH1057336  (ONISHI NOBORU, et al) [A] 1-21 * , fig. 2; paragraph [0017] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2002360572  (KAWASUMI LAB INC) [Y] 1-21 * , fig. 1, 2; paragraph [0009] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005128134  (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-21 * , abstract (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007185136  (GUNMA PREFECTURE) [A] 1-15 * , paragraph [0016] (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2008076099  (SARVAZYAN ARMEN P [US], et al) [A] 1-21* , abstract & WO 2008/021720 A2 *;
 [A]JP2009216690  (UNIV CHIBA) [A] 7, 19-21 * , abstract (Family: none) *;
 [Y]WO2010016353  (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 13 * , fig. 1, 2; paragraphs [0043] to [0060] & JP 5214733 B *;
 [Y]JP2013015789  (HOSODA SHC KK, et al) [Y] 7-10, 14, 19-21 * , paragraph [0030]; fig. 4(d); paragraph [0036]; fig. 5(e), 6(f); paragraphs [0044] to [0049] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015036809  (TECHNOCAST CO LTD) [A] 5, 6, 16-20 * , abstract (Family: none) *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.