Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3322533

EP3322533 - CUSTOMIZABLE INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hycor Biomedical, LLC
3021 E. 98th St.
Suite 220
Indianapolis, IN 46280 / US
[2018/21]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN CLEVE, Mark, David
3348 E. 1st Street
Long Beach, CA 90803 / US
02 / TAINE, Elaine, Grace
1221 S. Masters Lane
Anaheim, CA 92804 / US
03 / ORTEGA, Stephanie, Tuvi
328 7th Street
Huntington Beach, CA 92704 / US
04 / CANFIELD, Douglas, John
405 E. Court Street
Ludington, MI 49431 / US
05 / REID, Taylor, Addison
6728 Blue Point Drive
Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US
06 / CHO, Eunbyul
22815 Cypress Drive
Carson, CA 90745 / US
07 / ARGUETA, Jocelyn, Lindari
201 E. 67th Way
Long Beach, CA 90805 / US
 [2018/21]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[2018/21]
Application number, filing date16825115.513.07.2016
[2018/21]
WO2016US42101
Priority number, dateUS201562192989P15.07.2015         Original published format: US 201562192989 P
US201562214740P04.09.2015         Original published format: US 201562214740 P
[2018/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017011560
Date:19.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3322533
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, G01N35/00, G01N35/04
[2019/12]
Former International [2018/21]B01L3/00, G01N35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/21]
TitleGerman:PERSONALISIERBARES INSTRUMENT[2018/21]
English:CUSTOMIZABLE INSTRUMENT[2018/21]
French:INSTRUMENT POUVANT ÊTRE PERSONNALISÉ[2018/21]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2018National basic fee paid 
29.01.2018Search fee paid 
29.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/21]
29.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012282684  (FRITCHIE PATRICK P [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0058] , [0059] , [0070] , [0098] , [0115] , [0148] , [0156] , [0172] , [0207] *;
 [Y]US2014256588  (GLEZER ELI N [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0034] , [0152] , [0158] , [0212]; figures 3(a)-3(e) *;
 [A]US2008241937  (WAKAMIYA YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0114]; figure 25 *;
 [A]JP2000266758  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0059]; figure 5 *
International search[Y]US2012282684  (Fritchie et al.) [Y] 1-26 * Abstract, para [0147], para [0121], para [0207], para [0172], para [0179], para [0140], para [047], Figure 14 *
 [Y]US2011104010  (Brown et al.) [Y] 1-26 * Abstract, para [025], para [028], para [031], para [058], para [018-[0025] *
 [A]US2014274784  (VanCleve et al.) [A] 1-26 * Abstract, para [006]-[021], figures 1-2 *