EP3333843 - SHIFT REGISTER, GATE DRIVING CIRCUIT, DISPLAY PANEL DRIVING METHOD, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Ordos Yuansheng Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. Ordos Equipment Manufacturing Base Dongsheng District Ordos, Inner Mongolia 017020 / CN | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Fuqiang No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
FAN, Jun No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Xiaochuan No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
DONG, Xue No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16825319.3 | 08.01.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016CN70491 | Priority number, date | CN201510477631 | 06.08.2015 Original published format: CN201510477631 | [2018/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017020549 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333843 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333843 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, G09G3/36, G11C19/28 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
G11C19/28 (EP,US);
G09G3/3655 (US);
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G09G3/3674 (US);
G09G3/3677 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0408 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0267 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0278 (US);
G09G2310/0281 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0283 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0286 (EP,US);
G09G3/3611 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/24] | G09G3/36, G11C19/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBEREGISTER, GATETREIBERSCHALTUNG, ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ANZEIGETAFEL SOWIE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/24] | English: | SHIFT REGISTER, GATE DRIVING CIRCUIT, DISPLAY PANEL DRIVING METHOD, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2018/24] | French: | REGISTRE À DÉCALAGE, CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE GRILLE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE, ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | Translation filed | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2016 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015016585 (TOYOTAKA KOUHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016]; figures 2, 7A-9 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0098] *; | [A]CN104778928 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 6, 7 *; | [XP]CN104978943 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [XP] 1-14* figures 3, 4 *; | US2017256220 [ ] (HUANG FEI [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0089] * | International search | [A]CN1424821 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN1848236 (TOPPOLY OPTOELECTRONICS CORP [CN]) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101009090 (TOPPOLY OPTOELECTRONICS CORP [CN]) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101136185 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2009175405 (CHEN CHUNG-CHUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-18* , the whole document *; | [A]CN102610185 (INNOCOM TECH SHENZHEN LTD, et al) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102819998 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-18 * , description, paragraphs [0050]-[0058], [0071]-[0089] and [0106], and figures 7, 8 and 10 *; | [A]CN103137081 (SHANGHAI TIANMA MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103578394 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103985366 (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al) [A] 1-18 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104966506 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-18 * , claims 1-12, description, paragraphs [0067]-[0150], and figures 1-12 *; | [PX]CN104978943 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-5 * , description, paragraphs [0068]-[0108], and figures 2-6 * |