Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3390528

EP3390528 - POLYMER COMPOSITION COMPRISING A DIELECTRIC LIQUID HAVING IMPROVED POLARITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
22.02.2019Change - extension statespublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nexans
4, Allée de l'Arche
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / PEREGO, Gabriele
Via Voghera 20
20144 Milan / IT
02 / MAZEL, Christelle
5 Rue des Genêts
38300 Ruy / FR
03 / MEYER, Matthias
Wakenitzmauer 14
23552 Lübeck / DE
04 / CHARRIER, Dimitri
2 Avenue Raymond de Veyssière
Allée 8
69130 Ecully / FR
05 / FESTAZ, Xavier
27 Rue des Coquines
Hameau de Monthoz
01800 Villieu-Loyes-Mollon / FR
06 / COMBESSIS, Anthony
6 Avenue de Corinthe
13006 Marseille / FR
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/43]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date16825525.515.12.2016
[2018/43]
WO2016FR53478
Priority number, dateFR2015006278218.12.2015         Original published format: FR 1562782
[2018/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017103509
Date:22.06.2017
Language:FR
[2017/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3390528
Date:24.10.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017
[2018/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/10
[2018/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
TitleGerman:POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINER DIELEKTRISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT MIT VERBESSERTER POLARITÄT[2018/43]
English:POLYMER COMPOSITION COMPRISING A DIELECTRIC LIQUID HAVING IMPROVED POLARITY[2018/43]
French:COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE COMPRENANT UN LIQUIDE DIÉLECTRIQUE PRÉSENTANT UNE POLARITÉ AMÉLIORÉE[2018/43]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2018National basic fee paid 
18.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
17.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]CN104448543  (SHANDONG DAWN POLYMER CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-3 * [I] 15;
 [XI]CN103102592  (BEIJING HAIKE HUACHANG NEW MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,3-12,14 * example 8 * [I] 15