Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469523

EP3469523 - AUTOMATIC QUBIT CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KELLY, Julian Shaw
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Kennedy, Richard E. , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16825954.719.12.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US67467
Priority number, dateUS20161517813609.06.2016         Original published format: US201615178136
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213698
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469523
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06N99/00, H03M13/11, G06F11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE QUBIT-KALIBRIERUNG[2019/16]
English:AUTOMATIC QUBIT CALIBRATION[2019/16]
French:ÉTALONNAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE BITS QUANTIQUES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]  - KELLY J ET AL, "Scalable in-situ qubit calibration during repetitive error detection", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160309), XP080688320 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - J Cramer ET AL, "Repeated quantum error correction on a continuously encoded qubit by real-time feedback", Nature Communications, London, doi:10.1038/ncomms11526, (20160501), page 11526, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1508.01388.pdf, (20170323), XP055357979 [A] 1-29 * abstract * * page 1 - page 4 * * Supplementary figure 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms11526