Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3380064

EP3380064 - PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2018/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHANKEL, Daniel
5 Lincoln Place
North Brunswick Township NJ 08902 / US
02 / NAWROCKI, Shiri
18 Porter Ave.
Tenafly New Jersey 07670 / US
03 / DUBOVOY, Viktor
29 Cherry Court
Cresskill New Jersey 07626 / US
04 / PAN, Long
3 Staudt Ct.
Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US
 [2018/51]
Former [2018/40]01 / SCHANKEL, Daniel
5 Lincoln Place
North Brunswick New Jersey 08902 / US
02 / NAWROCKI, Shiri
18 Porter Ave.
Tenafly New Jersey 07670 / US
03 / DUBOVOY, Viktor
29 Cherry Court
Cresskill New Jersey 07626 / US
04 / PAN, Long
3 Staudt Ct.
Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/40]
Application number, filing date16826628.627.12.2016
[2018/40]
WO2016US68769
Priority number, dateUS201562273315P30.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562273315 P
[2018/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017117155
Date:06.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3380064
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017
[2018/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/24, A61Q15/00, A61K8/19, A61K8/21
[2018/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN[2020/01]
English:PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS[2018/40]
French:COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES[2020/01]
Former [2018/40]KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Former [2018/40]COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS PERSONNELS
Entry into regional phase26.06.2018National basic fee paid 
26.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/40]
26.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2012207686  (FRUGE LINH [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,16,19,21,22,24-27 * example 1; claim - *;
 [X]US5487906  (DIXIT NAGARAJ [US], et al) [X] 1-11,16,21-27 * examples H-L; table I *;
 [X]US2006141072  (ARVANITIDOU EVANGELIA S [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,16,17,19,21,24-27 * table 3 *;
 [X]US2004042978  (EMBRO WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1-7,20,24-27 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1,2,5,6 *;
 [I]US2145583  (CARLSON GRACE W) [I] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2236387  (WALLACE JR JOHN H, et al) [I] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3934004  (ORREN LEONARD J) [A] 1-28 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 3, line 1 - line 13 * * column 4, line 32 - line 43 *;
 [XP]WO2016105438  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [XP] 1-10,16,17,19,21,22,24-27 * table 1 *;
 [XP]WO2016178652  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [XP] 1-10,16,17,19,21,22,24-27 * table 1 *