Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469585

EP3469585 - SCALABLE DYNAMIC CLASS LANGUAGE MODELING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEINER, Justin Max
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View California 94043 / US
02 / ALEKSIC, Petar
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View California 94043 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Robinson, David Edward Ashdown
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16826680.730.12.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US69474
Priority number, dateUS201662347250P08.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347250 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213709
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469585
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/197, G10L15/18
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SKALIERBARE DYNAMISCHE KLASSENBASIERTE SPRACHMODELLIERUNG[2019/16]
English:SCALABLE DYNAMIC CLASS LANGUAGE MODELING[2019/16]
French:MODÉLISATION DE LANGAGE DE CLASSE DYNAMIQUE ÉVOLUTIF[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2006037219  (INAGO CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraphs [0012] , [0040] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] * * paragraph [0079] * [I] 3-7;
 [XPI]  - LUCY VASSERMAN ET AL, "Contextual language model adaptation using dynamic classes", 2016 IEEE SPOKEN LANGUAGE TECHNOLOGY WORKSHOP (SLT), (20161201), doi:10.1109/SLT.2016.7846301, ISBN 978-1-5090-4903-5, pages 441 - 446, XP055345758 [XP] 1,2,5-9 * section '2. SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE'; page 442, column l, paragraph 4 - page 444, column l, paragraph 1 * [I] 3,4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SLT.2016.7846301
 [A]  - Petar Aleksic ET AL, "Bringing Contextual Information to Google Speech Recognition", INTERSPEECH 2015, (20150906), pages 468 - 472, URL: https://static.googleusercontent.com/media/research.google.com/en//pubs/archive/43819.pdf, (20170214), XP055345740 [A] 1,8,9 * page 468, column l, paragraph l - page 468, column r, paragraph 1 * * sections '2.2. Biasing class-based language models' and '2.3. Handling out-of-vocabulary words'; page 469 *