Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3333459

EP3333459 - STRUCTURE FOR LUBRICATING PLANETARY GEAR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
[2018/24]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHITOMI, Mamoru
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
02 / AKAHORI, Hirofumi
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
03 / NISHIDA, Tooru
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
 [2018/24]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/24]
Application number, filing date16832496.027.07.2016
[2018/24]
WO2016JP03483
Priority number, dateJP2015015172531.07.2015         Original published format: JP 2015151725
[2018/24]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017022213
Date:09.02.2017
Language:JA
[2017/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3333459
Date:13.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16H57/04, F16H1/28, F16J15/18, F16J15/447, F16H57/08
[2019/24]
Former International [2018/24]F16H57/04, F16H1/28, F16J15/18, F16J15/447
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/24]
TitleGerman:STRUKTUR ZUR SCHMIERUNG EINER PLANETENGETRIEBEVORRICHTUNG[2018/24]
English:STRUCTURE FOR LUBRICATING PLANETARY GEAR DEVICE[2018/24]
French:STRUCTURE DE LUBRIFICATION DE DISPOSITIF À ENGRENAGE PLANÉTAIRE[2018/24]
Entry into regional phase08.02.2018Translation filed 
08.02.2018National basic fee paid 
08.02.2018Search fee paid 
08.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/24]
08.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP2752593  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 40]; figures 2-3 * [A] 2,3
International search[A]JPS60169462U  (Kawasaki Heavy Industries, Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , specification, page 1, line 16 to page 3, line 14; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014005841  (MITSUBISHI RUBBER) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; fig. 1 to 14 & KR 10-2013-0143482 A & CN 103511629 A & TW 201400736 A *;
 [A]JP2014088962  (RIKEN KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; fig. 1 to 8 & US 2014/0008876 A1 entire text; fig. 1 to 8 & EP 2765339 A1 & WO 2013/094657 A1 & KR 10-2013-0100004 A & CN 103415730 A *;
 [A]GB2234035  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; fig. 1 to 5 & US 5107676 A *