Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3330573

EP3330573 - GEAR COOLING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/23]COOLING MECHANISM FOR GEAR
[2019/42]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
[2018/23]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHITOMI, Mamoru
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
02 / AKAHORI, Hirofumi
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
03 / ARISAWA, Hidenori
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
04 / SHINODA, Yuji
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
05 / YAMASHITA, Seiji
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho, Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
 [2018/23]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/23]
Application number, filing date16832497.827.07.2016
[2018/23]
WO2016JP03484
Priority number, dateJP2015015172631.07.2015         Original published format: JP 2015151726
[2018/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017022214
Date:09.02.2017
Language:JA
[2017/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3330573
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16H57/04, F02C7/00, F02C7/32, F02C7/36, F16H1/28
[2018/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/23]
TitleGerman:KÜHLSTRUKTUR EINES GETRIEBES[2019/42]
English:GEAR COOLING STRUCTURE[2019/42]
French:MÉCANISME DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'ENGRENAGE[2019/42]
Former [2018/23]KÜHLMECHANISMUS FÜR GETRIEBE
Former [2018/23]COOLING MECHANISM FOR GEAR
Former [2018/23]MÉCANISME DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR ENGRENAGE
Entry into regional phase08.02.2018Translation filed 
08.02.2018National basic fee paid 
08.02.2018Search fee paid 
08.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/23]
08.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2020Fee for grant paid
14.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US8935853  (SHERIDAN WILLIAM G [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * column 4, lines 45-53; figure 4 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US8777792  (IMAI HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 6, lines 18-39; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [X]DE3607711  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *
International search[XY]JP2008014489  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 1, 3-6 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0016]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 2008/0006018 A1 paragraphs [0012] to [0021]; fig. 1 to 5 & WO 2014/099087 A2 & EP 1876338 A2 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]WO2011129076  (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0019], [0040] to [0044]; fig. 1 to 9 & US 2013/0102432 A1 paragraphs [0026] to [0027], [0048] to [0053]; fig. 1 to 9 & WO 2011/129076 A1 & EP 2559913 A1 *;
 [A]JPH09507284  (United Technologies Corp.) [A] 1-6 * , page 8, line 14 to page 13, line 9; fig. 1 to 3 & WO 95/18319 A1 page 5, line 1 to page 9, line 36; fig. 1 to 3 & EP 737281 A *;
 [A]JP2001208146  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0019], [0025] to [0026]; fig. 1 to 5 & US 6223616 B1 column 4, lines 36 to 67; column 5, line 43 to column 6, line 12; fig. 1 to 5 & EP 1114949 A2 *