Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3329769

EP3329769 - TOILET FOR ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Kinseichoshimobun
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2018/23]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAGI, Chiyo
c/o Unicharm Corporation
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / KANEKO, Shinya
c/o Unicharm Corporation
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2018/23]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/23]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16832598.303.06.2016
[2018/23]
WO2016JP66561
Priority number, dateJP2015015240231.07.2015         Original published format: JP 2015152402
[2018/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017022319
Date:09.02.2017
Language:JA
[2017/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3329769
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/01
[2018/31]
Former International [2018/23]A01K23/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/23]
TitleGerman:TOILETTE FÜR TIERE[2018/23]
English:TOILET FOR ANIMALS[2018/23]
French:TOILETTES POUR ANIMAUX[2018/23]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2018Translation filed 
29.01.2018National basic fee paid 
29.01.2018Search fee paid 
29.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/23]
29.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2007068461  (HILL ROGER B [NZ]) [X] 1-8,10-12 * figures 3, 4, 7, 8,31, 33, 22 * [A] 9;
 [XA]JP2009136273  (IRIS OHYAMA INC) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-12 * figures 1, 4, 5, 12, 14,16; claim 1 * [A] 4,5,8,9;
 [A]JP2005006605  (UNICHARM PETCARE CORP) [A] 1-12 * figure 5 *;
 [A]EP1790219  (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,4a *
International search[Y]JP2005006605  (UNICHARM PETCARE CORP) [Y] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0042] to [0059]; fig. 1 to 9 & US 2004/0261727 A1 paragraphs [0057] to [0075]; fig. 1 to 9 & EP 001488691 A2 & KR 10-2006-0036067 A & CN 001640246 A *;
 [Y]JPS5541148U  (Chojirushi Plastics Kabushiki Kaisha) [Y] 1-12 * , page 3, line 11 to page 4, line 12; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP3138034U  (Kion Kabushiki Kaisha) [Y] 1-12 * , paragraph [0006]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2005287367  (KAINUMA TAKASHI) [Y] 3-12 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0055]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]WO2013008532  (UNICHARM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 5-12 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0074]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 2014-0150727 A1 paragraphs [0007] to [0090]; fig. 1 to 4 & EP 002732699 A1 & CN 103648271 A *;
 [Y]JP2014195430  (DAIO SEISHI KK) [Y] 7-12 * , paragraph [0090]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2014195776  (DAIO SEISHI KK) [Y] 7-12 * , paragraph [0090]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2012213362  (KIMURA SAORI) [Y] 8-12 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0028]; fig. 1 to 9 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS612052U  (Bonbi Co., Ltd.) [Y] 9-12 * , page 3, line 12 to page 7, line 4; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2006025435  (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2008-0035069 A1 entire text; all drawings & EP 001790219 A1 *