blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3328445

EP3328445 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MICROBIAL STERILIZATION USING POLYCHROMATIC LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2021  [2021/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lumagenics, LLC
111 West Church Street
Nashville, NC 27856 / US
[2019/51]
Former [2018/23]For all designated states
Hyper Light Technologies, LLC
111 West Church Street
Nashville, NC 27856 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GARRETT, Kurt A.
10350 Sugarberry Ct. 402
Raleigh, NC 27614 / US
 [2018/23]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2018/23]
Application number, filing date16833630.329.07.2016
[2018/23]
WO2016US44798
Priority number, dateUS20151481551931.07.2015         Original published format: US201514815519
[2018/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017023783
Date:09.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3328445
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU09.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61N5/06, A61L2/10, A61M1/36
[2018/27]
CPC:
A61L2/10 (EP,US); A61L2/0047 (EP,US); A61N5/0624 (EP);
G02B27/141 (EP,US); G02B2006/0325 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2018/23]A61L2/10, A61M1/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/23]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MIKROBIELLEN STERILISATION MIT POLYCHROMATISCHEM LICHT[2018/23]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MICROBIAL STERILIZATION USING POLYCHROMATIC LIGHT[2018/23]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE STÉRILISATION MICROBIENNE À L'AIDE D'UNE LUMIÈRE POLYCHROMATIQUE[2018/23]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2018National basic fee paid 
27.02.2018Search fee paid 
27.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/23]
27.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/27]
19.02.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2021/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202005   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010222852  (VASILY DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1-17,19,20 * paragraphs [0036] , [0059] - [0062] - [0098] - [0104] - [0121] , [0122]; figures 1,2A,2B * [I] 18;
 [X]US6447537  (HARTMAN RAYMOND A [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 54; figure 1 * * column 13, line 51 - line 54 *
International search[XY]US2003086817  (HORTON III ISAAC B) [X] 1, 3-13, 15, 17 * , paragraphs [ 0019]-[0024], [0026]-[0031], [0033]-[0040], figs. 1, 2, claims * [Y] 2, 14, 16, 18-20
 [Y]WO0191810  (PUREPULSE TECHNOLOGIES, INC et al.) [Y] 2, 14, 16, 18-20 * , p. 9, paragraph 2, claims *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.