blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3555456

EP3555456 - A DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AN ENGINE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.04.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volvo Truck Corporation
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[2019/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BOETE, Yann
14 Rue de Nuits
69009 Lyon / FR
 [2019/43]
Representative(s)Germain Maureau
12, rue Boileau
69006 Lyon / FR
[2024/14]
Former [2019/43]Delorme, Nicolas, et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date16834100.616.12.2016
[2019/43]
WO2016IB01916
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018109515
Date:21.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3555456
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3555456
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:F02N15/04, B60K6/383, F16H3/72
[2019/07]
CPC:
F02N15/046 (EP,US); B60K6/365 (EP,US); B60K25/02 (EP,US);
B60K6/26 (US); B60K6/383 (EP,US); B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/485 (EP,US); F02B67/06 (EP,US); F02N15/022 (EP,US);
F02N15/08 (EP,US); F16H3/725 (EP,US); B60K2006/268 (EP,US);
B60K2006/4841 (EP,US); B60K2025/024 (EP,US); B60W2300/12 (EP);
B60Y2200/92 (US); B60Y2400/73 (EP); F02N11/0814 (EP);
F16H2200/2005 (EP,US); F16H2200/2082 (US); F16H2200/2094 (US);
F16H3/44 (EP); Y02T10/62 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/43]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EIN ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EINE ANORDNUNG EINES MOTORS[2024/02]
English:A DRIVE SYSTEM FOR AN ENGINE ARRANGEMENT[2019/43]
French:UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN ARRANGEMENT DE MOTEUR[2024/02]
Former [2019/43]ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EINE MOTORANORDNUNG
Former [2019/43]SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR ENSEMBLE MOTEUR
Entry into regional phase21.06.2019National basic fee paid 
21.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/43]
21.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2024Fee for grant paid
26.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2009121188  (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,6,10,11,13-15,19 * paragraph [0037]; figures 3,5 * [I] 16;
 [XAI]US2011319214  (SHOWALTER DAN JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,3,6,10-12,14,15,19 * paragraph [0013]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,5,7-9,13,17,18,20-25 [I] 16;
 [A]WO2012097774  (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-25* figure - *;
 [A]DE102011010088  (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-25;
 [A]WO2013120602  (IWIS MOTORSYSTEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-25 * page 14, line 5 - line 22 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 1 *
ExaminationWO2017017492
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.