Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3335644

EP3335644 - AURICLE CLAMP AND DELIVERY DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Med Zenith Medical Scientific Co., Ltd.
No.5 2nd Zhuyuan Street
Tianzhu Free Trade Zone
Shunyi District
Beijing 101312 / CN
[2018/25]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHOU, Qingliang
No.5 2nd Zhuyuan street
Tianzhu Free Trade Zone
Shunyi District
Beijing 101312 / CN
02 / LI, Jinshan
No.5 2nd Zhuyuan street
Tianzhu Free Trade Zone
Shunyi District
Beijing 101312 / CN
03 / KE, Danian
No.5 2nd Zhuyuan street
Tianzhu Free Trade Zone
Shunyi District
Beijing 101312 / CN
04 / MENG, Jian
No.5 2nd Zhuyuan street
Tianzhu Free Trade Zone
Shunyi District
Beijing 101312 / CN
 [2018/25]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2018/25]
Application number, filing date16834504.906.06.2016
[2018/25]
WO2016CN84948
Priority number, dateCN20151050513711.08.2015         Original published format: CN201510505137
[2018/25]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017024879
Date:16.02.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3335644
Date:20.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN16.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/122
[2018/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/25]
TitleGerman:VORHOFKLEMME UND FREISETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2018/25]
English:AURICLE CLAMP AND DELIVERY DEVICE THEREOF[2018/25]
French:PINCE POUR PAVILLON AURICULAIRE ET DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE CELLE-CI[2018/25]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2018Translation filed 
23.01.2018National basic fee paid 
23.01.2018Search fee paid 
23.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011046437  (KASSAB GHASSAN S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0088] - [0090]; figure 10 * [I] 6-8;
 [X]WO2007102151  (NITI MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * page 23, line 9 - page 25, line 18; figure 3a *;
 [X]WO2015095333  (STANDARD BARIATRICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0156] - [0159] - [0184]; figures 6, 13b *;
 [X]WO2007019268  (KELLEHER BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] - [0 55] - [0063]; figure 4a *;
 [A]US2012059400  (WILLIAMSON IV WARREN P [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0066] - [0069] *;
 [A]US2012109161  (PRIVITERA SALVATORE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0063] - [0067]; figure 22 *;
 [X]AU2007202365  (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC) [X] 10-13 * paragraphs [0034] - [0039]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2015073439  (DANNAHER WILLIAM D [US]) [X] 10-12 * paragraphs [0036] - [0041]; figure 8b *;
 [X]US2004044363  (FOWLER DAVID N [US]) [X] 10-12 * paragraphs [0048] - [0053]; figure 3 *;
 [X]JPH07275253  (TERUMO CORP) [X] 10 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0625335  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 10-13 * page 9, line 18 - page 11, line 24; figure 9 *
International search[PX]CN105193471  (BEIJING MAIDI DINGFENG MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-13 * claims 1 to 13 *;
 [X]CN102573665  (RAPTOR RIDGE LLC) [X] 10-13 * description, paragraphs [0029]-[0034] and figures 1 to 8 *;
 [A]CN203074795U  (BEIJING MAIDI DINGFENG MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * description, paragraph [0042] and figures 3A to 5 *;
 [A]US2007149988  (MICHLER ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101467908  (BEIJING MAIDI DINGFENG MEDICAL [CN]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012109161  (PRIVITERA SALVATORE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008208324  (GLITHERO JASON I [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *