Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3337164

EP3337164 - HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc.
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2018/25]
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIOKA, Manabu
c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc.
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / TADA, Shotaro
c/o Sony Global Manufacturing&Operations
Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / KUSUNOKI, Toshihiro
c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc.
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2018/25]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2018/25]
Application number, filing date16835068.404.08.2016
[2018/25]
WO2016JP72967
Priority number, dateJP2015015897611.08.2015         Original published format: JP 2015158976
[2018/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017026371
Date:16.02.2017
Language:JA
[2017/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3337164
Date:20.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/02, G02B27/00, G06K9/00
[2019/15]
Former International [2018/25]H04N5/64, G02B27/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/25]
TitleGerman:KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGE[2018/25]
English:HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY[2018/25]
French:VISIOCASQUE[2018/25]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2018Translation filed 
05.02.2018National basic fee paid 
05.02.2018Search fee paid 
05.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/25]
06.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1131663  (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB]) [A] 3 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 *;
 [XP]WO2016103525  (FOVE INC [JP]) [XP] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0014] , [0029] , [0073] - [0077]; figure 8 *;
 [XP]WO2015198477  (FOVE INC [JP]) [XP] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0025] , [0033] , [0038]; figure 3 *
 [XI]  - Rolf R Hainich ET AL, "Chapter 10.12: Adaptive Displays and Eye Tracking", Displays : Fundamentals and Applications, CRC Press, (20110101), vol. 12, pages 481 - 493, ISBN 978-1-56881-439-1, XP055561737 [X] 1,2,5,6 * pages 481-485; figures 10.48-10.51 * [I] 3,4
 [A]  - HONG HUA ET AL, "Video-based eyetracking methods and algorithms in head-mounted displays", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20060101), vol. 14, no. 10, doi:10.1364/OE.14.004328, ISSN 1094-4087, page 4328, XP055014710 [A] 4 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.14.004328
International search[PX]JP5824697B  (Fove, Inc.) [PX] 1-3, 5-6 * , paragraphs [0014], [0029], [0073] to [0077]; fig. 1, 8 & WO 2016/103525 A1 *;
 [PX]WO2015198477  (FOVE INC [JP]) [PX] 1-3, 5-6 * , paragraphs [0025], [0033], [0038]; fig. 3 & WO 2015/198502 A1 *;
 [A]JP2002328330  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0030], [0040]; fig. 2, 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH089205  (CANON KK) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0056] to [0058]; fig. 1 & US 6018630 A1 column 7, lines 42 to 71; fig. 7 *;
 [A]JP2008241822  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0001], [0026] to [0027]; fig. 6 (Family: none) *