blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3389828

EP3389828 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING GASEOUS AND PARTICULATE MATERIALS FROM A GAS FLOW BY MEANS OF A FLUIDISED-BED FLOW REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/43]METHOD FOR SEPARATING GASEOUS OR PARTICULATE MATERIALS FROM A GAS FLOW BY MEANS OF A FLUIDISED-BED FLOW REACTOR
[2020/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.03.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.03.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steinmüller Engineering GmbH
Fabrikstrasse 5
51643 Gummersbach / DE
[2020/22]
Former [2018/43]For all designated states
Graf Enviropro GmbH
Am Zollstock 1
61381 Friedrichsdorf / Taunus / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRAND, Tobias
Bergstr.11
63762 Großostheim / DE
02 / GUTPERL, Winfried
Tannenweg 13
36151 Burghaun / DE
03 / MÖBS, Maria Helena
Kolpingweg 58
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
04 / TREUBEL, Jochen
Neuhäuserstr. 41b
79199 Kirchzarten / DE
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Hebing, Norbert
Frankfurter Strasse 34
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/43]Hebing, Norbert
Frankfurter Strasse 34
D-61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
Application number, filing date16836198.816.12.2016
[2018/43]
WO2016DE100594
Priority number, dateDE20151012223018.12.2015         Original published format: DE102015122230
[2018/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2017101913
Date:22.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3389828
Date:24.10.2018
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3389828
Date:13.05.2020
Language:DE
[2020/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.08.2017
ClassificationIPC:B01D53/10, B01D53/12, B01D53/30
[2018/43]
CPC:
B01D53/12 (EP); B01D53/10 (EP); B01D53/30 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SEPARIERUNG VON GASFÖRMIGEN UND PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN STOFFEN AUS EINEM GASSTROM MITTELS EINES WIRBELSCHICHTSTRÖMUNGSREAKTORS[2020/04]
English:METHOD FOR SEPARATING GASEOUS AND PARTICULATE MATERIALS FROM A GAS FLOW BY MEANS OF A FLUIDISED-BED FLOW REACTOR[2020/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE SUBSTANCES GAZEUSES ET PARTICULAIRES PRÉSENTES DANS UN FLUX DE GAZ AU MOYEN D'UN RÉACTEUR D'ÉCOULEMENT À LIT FLUIDISÉ[2020/04]
Former [2018/43]VERFAHREN ZUR SEPARIERUNG VON GASFÖRMIGEN ODER PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN STOFFEN AUS EINEM GASSTROM MITTELS EINES WIRBELSCHICHTSTRÖMUNGSREAKTORS
Former [2018/43]METHOD FOR SEPARATING GASEOUS OR PARTICULATE MATERIALS FROM A GAS FLOW BY MEANS OF A FLUIDISED-BED FLOW REACTOR
Former [2018/43]PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE SUBSTANCES GAZEUSES OU PARTICULAIRES PRÉSENTES DANS UN FLUX DE GAZ AU MOYEN D'UN RÉACTEUR D'ÉCOULEMENT À LIT FLUIDISÉ
Entry into regional phase08.06.2018National basic fee paid 
08.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
08.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2020Fee for grant paid
27.02.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.03.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU16.12.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/28]AL13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU16.12.2020
Former [2021/47]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU16.12.2020
Former [2021/40]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS13.09.2020
Cited inExaminationEP0490414
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.