Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3340729

EP3340729 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
[2018/26]
Inventor(s)01 / SUYAMA Akihiko
c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
02 / SHIRAI Masakazu
c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
03 / SUEMITSU Yuki
c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
04 / AKUTAGAWA Tomoyoshi
c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
 [2018/26]
Representative(s)Ettmayr, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/26]
Application number, filing date16837170.619.08.2016
[2018/26]
WO2016JP74194
Priority number, dateJP2015016232919.08.2015         Original published format: JP 2015162329
[2018/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017030181
Date:23.02.2017
Language:JA
[2017/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3340729
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/02, H04W8/00, // H04W84/12, H04W84/18
[2019/01]
Former International [2018/26]H04W76/02, G10K15/02, H04W8/00, H04W84/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/26]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2018/26]
English:COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE MANAGEMENT METHOD[2018/26]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION[2018/26]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2018Translation filed 
19.02.2018National basic fee paid 
19.02.2018Search fee paid 
19.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/26]
19.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]US2013173794  (AGERBAK MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 3-7,9 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0136] *;
 [IA]US2010115262  (SUYAMA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1,11,15 * abstract * * figures 1,3B,4 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 2-10,12-14,16-19;
 [A]  - HIERTZ G R ET AL, "IEEE 802.11s: The WLAN Mesh Standard", TECHNICAL REPORT OF WIRELESS NETWORKING GROUP, COORDINATED SCIENCE LABORATORY; DEPT. ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING; UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS AT URBANA-CHAMPAIGN, US, (20100201), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 1536-1284, pages 104 - 111, XP011303163 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2008148031  (YAMATAKE CORP) [A] 1-19 * , abstract (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2006081164  (IWATSU ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0011], [0034] to [0046], [0102] to [0111] & US 2006/0034235 A1 paragraphs [0026], [0096] to [0140] & EP 1626537 A1 *;
 [A]JP2001359200  (YAMAHA CORP) [A] 1-19 * , abstract (Family: none) *