Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3335096

EP3335096 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOMECHANICALLY-BASED EYE SIGNALS FOR INTERACTING WITH REAL AND VIRTUAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2018/25]
Inventor(s)01 / MARGGRAFF, Lewis James
20 Toledo Court
Lafayette, CA 94549 / US
02 / PUBLICOVER, Nelson George
355 Douglas Fir Circle
Reno, NV 89511 / US
03 / CONNAUGHTON, Spencer James
909 Ramona Street
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
04 / LORD, Nathan
77 North Almaden Avenue
Apt. 1121
San Jose, CA 95110 / US
05 / MILFORD, Peter N.
41 Manzanita Avenue
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
06 / MALEEV, Ivan
5375 Black Avenue 1
Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US
 [2018/25]
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/25]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date16837677.015.08.2016
[2018/25]
WO2016US47105
Priority number, dateUS201562205707P15.08.2015         Original published format: US 201562205707 P
US201562252347P06.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562252347 P
US201662319751P07.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662319751 P
[2018/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017031089
Date:23.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3335096
Date:20.06.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017
[2018/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.02.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0485, G06F1/16, G02B27/01, A61B3/113, G06F3/03, G06F3/042, G06F3/023
[2019/10]
Former International [2018/25]G06F3/01, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0485, G06F1/16, G02B27/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/25]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUGENSIGNALE AUF BIOMECHANISCHER BASIS ZUR INTERAKTION MIT ECHTEN UND VIRTUELLEN OBJEKTEN[2018/25]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOMECHANICALLY-BASED EYE SIGNALS FOR INTERACTING WITH REAL AND VIRTUAL OBJECTS[2018/25]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À DES SIGNAUX OCULAIRES BASÉS SUR LA BIOMÉCANIQUE ET PERMETTANT D'ENTRER EN INTERACTION AVEC DES OBJETS RÉELS ET VIRTUELS[2018/25]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2017National basic fee paid 
27.10.2017Search fee paid 
27.10.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2017Examination requested  [2018/25]
27.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - CARLOS H MORIMOTO ET AL, "Context switching for fast key selection in text entry applications", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2010 SYMPOSIUM ON EYE-TRACKING RESEARCH & APPLICATIONS, ETRA '10, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20100322), doi:10.1145/1743666.1743730, ISBN 978-1-60558-994-7, pages 271 - 274, XP058123579 [X] 1-7,9,15 * the whole document * [I] 8,10-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1743666.1743730
International search[XY]US2014247210  (HENDEREK DAVID FIGGINS [SE], et al) [X] 10-12, 15-31, 34-41 , 44, 53, 56-57, 60-65 , 84-98, 102-169 * See paragraphs [0014], [0053], [0057], [0060], [0062], [0067], [0088]-[0089], [0107], [0117], [0124], [0151]-[0152], [0161], [0163]: claims 1, 4, 6, 14, 20, 23; and figures 6, 7B, 13. * [Y] 1-9, 13-14, 32-33 , 42-43, 45-52, 54-55 , 58-59, 66-83 , 99-101, 170-171;
 [Y]US2014096077  (JACOB MICHAL [IL], et al) [Y] 1-9, 58-59, 66-69 , 170-171 * See paragraphs [0029], [0031]; and figure 6. *;
 [Y]US2014173407  (KRUGLICK EZEKIEL [US]) [Y] 13-14, 32-33, 42-43 , 45-52, 54-55 * See paragraph [0051]; claim 1; and figure 7. *;
 [Y]US2007024579  (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]) [Y] 70-83, 99-101 * See paragraphs [0052], [0066], [0068], [0087]; claims 9, 19, 24, 27; and figure 1A. *;
 [Y]US2015169050  (PUBLICOVER NELSON G [US], et al) [Y] 71-74, 80 * See paragraph [0045]; claims 7, 32; and figure 4. *
by applicant   - "Context Switching for Fast Key Selection in Text Entry Applications", MORIMOTO, C. H.AMIR, A., Proceedings of the 2010 Symposium on Eye-Tracking Research & Applications, Association for Computing Machinery, Inc., (20100000), pages 271 - 274