Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2017035320

WO2017035320 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR TISSUE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vomaris Innovations, Inc.
1911 East Fifth Street
Tempe, AZ 85281 / US
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / PALUSZCYK, Troy
c/o Vomaris Innovations Inc.
1911 East Fifth Street
Tempe, Arizona 85281 / US
02 / KING, Wendell
2746 Sylvan LN SW
Pillager, Minnesota 56473 / US
[N/P]
Application number, filing date16840096.825.08.2016
WO2016US48605
Priority number, dateUS201562210337P26.08.2015         Original published format: US 201562210337 P
US201562246723P27.10.2015         Original published format: US 201562246723 P
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017035320
Date:02.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/04, A61N1/18, A61N1/32, A61N1/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleEnglish:METHODS AND DEVICES FOR TISSUE TREATMENT
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSUS
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/38]
27.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/38]
04.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2018/38]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2008033492  (SIFF BRADFORD [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [Y]US7618643  (SCHULTZ CLYDE L [US]) [Y] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [Y]CN201131852Y  (JIANPING CUI [CN]) [Y] 5, 6 * see machine translation *;
 [A]US8805522  (CHAPMAN-JONES DAVID JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [A]US8290581  (KRIKSUNOV LEO B [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *;
 [A]US7904147  (SCHNEIDER LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *