blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: WO2017035320


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.08.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
13.08.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
08.05.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication