blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: WO2017035320
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018243550Global Dossier 30.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201562246723 27.10.2015
WO2016US48605 25.08.2016
US201562210337 26.08.2015
US201615754556 25.08.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017035320Global Dossier 02.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201562246723 27.10.2015
US201562210337 26.08.2015