Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3342383

EP3342383 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SHEET-SHAPED MEMBER FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Kinseichoshimobun
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2018/27]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEUCHI, Kenji
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION
Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2018/27]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/27]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16841179.105.04.2016
[2018/27]
WO2016JP61063
Priority number, dateJP2015016852328.08.2015         Original published format: JP 2015168523
[2018/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017038147
Date:09.03.2017
Language:JA
[2017/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3342383
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2018/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BAHNFÖRMIGEN ELEMENTS FÜR EINEN SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKEL[2018/27]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SHEET-SHAPED MEMBER FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2018/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT EN FORME DE FEUILLE POUR ARTICLE ABSORBANT[2018/27]
Entry into regional phase08.02.2018Translation filed 
08.02.2018National basic fee paid 
08.02.2018Search fee paid 
08.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
08.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US6743314  (HENRY DOUGLASS SCOTT [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 5 * * column 5, line 33 - column 8, line 11 *
International search[YA]JP4246020B  (Oji Paper Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-3, 5, 14, 16 * , paragraphs [0032] to [0033], [0059], [0065] to [0069]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 4, 6-13, 15;
 [Y]JPH08332520  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-3, 5, 14, 16 * , paragraph [0042]; fig. 7 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2012224027  (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [Y] 1-3, 5, 14, 16 * , paragraph [0008] & EP 2700498 A1 paragraph [0015] *;
 [Y]JPH01275357  (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-3, 5, 14, 16 * , page 3, upper left column, lines 5 to 20; lower left column, line 17 to lower right column, line 17; page 4, upper left column, line 3 to upper right column, line 13; fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2008105808  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 5, 14 * , paragraphs [0018], [0022], [0026] to [0027]; fig. 1 to 2 & EP 2085343 A1 paragraphs [0020], [0024], [0029]; fig. 1 to 2 *;
 [Y]JP2007528330  (Fabio Perini S.p.A.) [Y] 14 * , paragraph [0033]; fig. 1 & US 2006/0175457 A1 paragraph [0014]; fig. 1 *;
 [A]JP2014031238  (SINKO KIKAI CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , (Family: none) *