Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3346460

EP3346460 - MUTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
[2018/28]
Inventor(s)01 / SUENAGA, Yuichiro
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
[2019/51]
Former [2018/28]01 / SUENAGA, Yuichiro
c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
Representative(s)Ettmayr, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/28]
Application number, filing date16841195.713.05.2016
[2018/28]
WO2016JP64399
Priority number, dateJP2015017252202.09.2015         Original published format: JP 2015172522
[2018/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017038163
Date:09.03.2017
Language:JA
[2017/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3346460
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G10D9/06, G10K11/16
[2018/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/28]
TitleGerman:STUMMSCHALTUNG[2018/28]
English:MUTE[2018/28]
French:SOURDINE[2018/28]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2018Translation filed 
29.03.2018National basic fee paid 
29.03.2018Search fee paid 
29.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/28]
29.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]AT413462B  (SCHLIPFINGER JOHANN [AT]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]US2014224098  (SUENAGA YUICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[A]US1445115  (TURNER JOHN C) [A] 1-6 * , fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [A]  - "Schlipf mutes", Tube.com, (20080124), URL: http://www.tuba-mute.com/index.php?lang=de&page=tourmute, (20160713), XP055366375 [A] 1-6