Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3346750

EP3346750 - APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2018/28]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKANO, Hiroaki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2018/28]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[2018/28]
Application number, filing date16841224.509.06.2016
[2018/28]
WO2016JP67158
Priority number, dateJP2015017490204.09.2015         Original published format: JP 2015174902
[2018/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017038192
Date:09.03.2017
Language:JA
[2017/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3346750
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, H04W16/14, H04W16/32, H04W48/16, H04W52/02
[2019/13]
Former International [2018/28]H04W24/10, H04W16/14, H04W16/32, H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/28]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2018/28]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD[2018/28]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ[2018/28]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2018Translation filed 
23.02.2018National basic fee paid 
23.02.2018Search fee paid 
23.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/28]
23.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AP]EP3030001  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] , [0129] - [0135] - [0174] *;
 [A]WO2015016573  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15;
 [A]WO2015115986  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * page 19 - page 28 *
    [XAYI] - NTT DOCOMO, "Views on Benefit of Small Cell Discovery Based on Discovery Signal", vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-133458, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/, (20130810), XP050716566 [X] 1,11,14,15 * paragraph [03.2]; figure 4b * [A] 8,9,12,13 [Y] 2-5 [I] 6,7,10
 [YA]  - ZTE, "Further considerations on enhanced transition procedures of small cell on/off scheme", vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20131111 - 20131115, (20131113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-135350 FURTHER CONSIDERATIONS ON ENHANCED TRANSITION PROCEDURES OF SMALL CELL ONOFF SCHEME, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20131113), XP050735033 [Y] 2-5 * paragraph [2.2.2] * [A] 1,6-15
International search[A]  - HUAWEI, "RAN3 Consideration for Small cell on/off and discovery", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3#84 R3-141048, (20140523), XP050790605 [A] 1-20
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "LAA Scell Activation and Deactivation", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2#91 R2-153779, (20150828), XP050993257 [A] 1-20
 [A]  - ETRI, "Discussion on Carrier Selection in LAA", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2#89bis R2-151292, (20150424), XP050936242 [A] 1-20
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on carrier selection for LAA", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#81 R1-152869, (20150529), XP050971137 [A] 1-20