blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3342344


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.03.2019 Supplementary search report published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Change - classification published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Change - classification published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
02.11.2018 Change: Validation states published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
02.11.2018 Change - extension states published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
27.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.06.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
01.06.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
01.06.2018 Request for examination filed published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
08.05.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
23.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.2018 Amendment by applicant
08.03.2018 Change - representative
08.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
20.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication