blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3342344
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018338735Global Dossier 29.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
KR20150121426 28.08.2015
WO2016KR09565 29.08.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3342344Global Dossier 24.04.2019A4
EP3342344 04.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
KR20150121426 28.08.2015
WO2016KR09565 29.08.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017039253Global Dossier 09.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
KR20150121426 28.08.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20170025241Global Dossier 08.03.2017A
Priority number Date
KR20150121426 28.08.2015