Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3342344

EP3342344 - X-RAY IMAGING APPARATUS HAVING FUNCTION OF GENERATING THREE-DIMENSIONAL SURFACE DATA AND PHOTOGRAPHING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vatech Co., Ltd.
13
Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co. Ltd.
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
[2018/27]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Keun Yeoung
13
Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
02 / KIM, Taewoo
13
Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
03 / YANG, Youn Joo
13
Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
04 / CHOI, Sung Il
13
Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18449 / KR
 [2018/27]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/27]
Application number, filing date16842219.429.08.2016
[2018/27]
WO2016KR09565
Priority number, dateKR2015012142628.08.2015         Original published format: KR 20150121426
[2018/27]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017039253
Date:09.03.2017
Language:KO
[2017/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3342344
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00, A61B6/14, A61B6/03, G01N23/046, G06T3/40, H04N5/32, H05G1/00, // A61B8/08, B23Q3/00, G01N23/2204, G01V5/00, G06T11/00, H01J37/20
[2019/17]
Former International [2018/27]A61B6/00, A61B6/14, A61B6/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/27]
TitleGerman:RÖNTGENBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT FUNKTION ZUR ERZEUGUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER OBERFLÄCHENDATEN UND FOTOGRAFIEVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2018/27]
English:X-RAY IMAGING APPARATUS HAVING FUNCTION OF GENERATING THREE-DIMENSIONAL SURFACE DATA AND PHOTOGRAPHING METHOD THEREOF[2018/27]
French:APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE PAR RAYONS X À FONCTION DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES DE SURFACE TRIDIMENSIONNELLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRISE DE VUES ASSOCIÉ[2018/27]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2018Translation filed 
07.03.2018National basic fee paid 
07.03.2018Search fee paid 
07.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/27]
07.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]KR20140044158  (VATECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figures 4,5 *;
 [Y]WO2014168796  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0055] , [0033] *
International search[YA]KR20150083338  (EWOO SOFT CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-3 * See abstract, paragraphs [20]-[27] and figure 1. * [A] 4-7;
 [Y]KR101092907B  (YI, Tae - Kyoung) [Y] 1-3 * See abstract, paragraph [36], claim 1 and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2007196009  (DEINZER FRANK [DE]) [A] 1-7 * See abstract, paragraph [57] and figure 3. *;
 [A]KR101242629B  (HONG YOUNG HWI [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See abstract and figures 2, 3. *;
 [A]US2007092850  (KAZA SRINIVAS [US]) [A] 1-7 * See abstract, paragraphs [18]-[20] and figures 1-2A. *