Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3344893

EP3344893 - WEAR OPTIMIZED PAD DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019Change - classificationpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019Change - classificationpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Spicer Foundation Brake LLC
901 Cleveland Avenue
Elyria, OH 44035 / US
[2018/28]
Inventor(s)01 / SABETI, Manouchehr
c\o BENDIX SPICER FOUNDATION BRAKE LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
 [2018/28]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/28]
Application number, filing date16842972.801.09.2016
[2018/28]
WO2016US49872
Priority number, dateUS20151484481303.09.2015         Original published format: US201514844813
[2018/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017040765
Date:09.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3344893
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/092, F16D55/228
[2018/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/28]
TitleGerman:VERSCHLEISSOPTIMIERTES BELAGDESIGN[2018/28]
English:WEAR OPTIMIZED PAD DESIGN[2018/28]
French:PLAQUETTE OPTIMISÉE VIS-À-VIS DE L'USURE[2018/28]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2018National basic fee paid 
26.03.2018Search fee paid 
26.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/28]
26.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5125482  (NEGISHI TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * column 1, line 64 - column 4, line 8; figures 1, 2 * [I] 6
 [XI]US2009236187  (BACH UWE [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7-11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [ 0017] - [0019] - [ 0038] , [ 0039] , [ 0042] - [0044]; figures 3, 7, 8 * [I] 6
 [X]US4915198  (HIRASHITA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 7-10 * column 1, line 40 - column 4, line 47; figures 2, 3, 5 *
 [X]DE4430955  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 7 * the whole document *
 [X]US2011290599  (VASEL) [X] 7 * , entire document. *
 [Y]US8505699  (KAPPAGANTU et al.) [Y] 1-11 * , entire document. *
 [Y]US2011073418  (KIM) [Y] 1-11 * , entire document. *
 [A]US2926757  (ARMSTRONG) [A] 1-11 * , entire document. *
 [A]US6386335  (DIPONIO) [A] 1-11 * , entire document. *