Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3348093

EP3348093 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING ACCESS BARRING CHECK FOR HIGH PRIORITY ACCESS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2018/29]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Youngdae
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / KIM, Jaehyun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2018/29]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/29]
Application number, filing date16844719.109.09.2016
[2018/29]
WO2016KR10136
Priority number, dateUS201562217020P10.09.2015         Original published format: US 201562217020 P
[2018/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017043903
Date:16.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3348093
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017
[2018/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR16.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/08, H04W48/02
[2019/04]
Former International [2018/29]H04W48/08, H04W48/02, H04W76/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON ZUGANGSSPERRUNGSPRÜFUNG FÜR ZUGANG MIT HOHER PRIORITÄT IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2018/29]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING ACCESS BARRING CHECK FOR HIGH PRIORITY ACCESS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2018/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER UNE VÉRIFICATION D'INTERDICTION D'ACCÈS POUR UN ACCÈS À PRIORITÉ ÉLEVÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2018/29]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2018National basic fee paid 
26.02.2018Search fee paid 
26.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/29]
26.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YPA]EP3030022  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [YP] 7,14 * paragraph [0058]; figure 9 * * paragraphs [0137] - [0163] * * paragraphs [0169] - [0182] * [A] 1-6,8-13;
 WO2015016546  [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * the whole document *;
 [XY]  - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Review of AC barring", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-083609 REVIEW OF AC BARRING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080702), vol. RAN WG2, no. Warsaw, Poland; 20080630 - 20080704, XP050603907 [X] 1-6,8-13 * pages 2-3; figure 2 * [Y] 7,14
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS ET AL, "Smart congestion mitigation in E-UTRAN for MMTEL and SMS", vol. CT WG1, no. Cape Town, South Africa; 20140714 - 20140718, (20140721), 3GPP DRAFT; C1-143222_SCM_LTE_24.301, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ct/WG1_mm-cc-sm_ex-CN1/TSGC1_88_Cape-Town/docs/, (20140721), XP050808551 [A] 1-14 * pages 14-18 *
International search[YA]US2015173119  (WIRTANEN JEFFREY WILLIAM [CA], et al) [Y] 1, 6-8, 13-14 * See paragraphs [0015], [0022], [0025]; claim 9; and figures 1, 2. * [A] 2-5, 9-12;
 [Y]US2015208334  (ZHANG YI [CN], et al) [Y] 1, 6-8, 13-14 * See paragraphs [0038], [0042]; and figure 2. *;
 [A]WO2015066383  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0076]-[0079]; claims 1-4; and figure 3. *;
 [A]US2015223146  (PINHEIRO ANA LUCIA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0043]; and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2013045706  (HSU CHIA-CHUN [TW]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0037]; and figure 7. *