EP3346947 - POLYMERIC ELECTROSPUN EMBOLIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/29] | POLYMERIC ELECTROSPUN EMBOLIZATION DEVICE AND METHODS OF USE | ||
[2022/23] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NFS IP Holdings, LLC 5164 Blazer Pkwy Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2022/52] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Nanofiber Solutions, LLC 5164 Blazer Parkway Dublin, OH 43017 / US | ||
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Nanofiber Solutions, LLC 4389 Weaver Court North Hilliard, Ohio 43026 / US | ||
Former [2018/29] | For all designated states Ikonano Venture Partners, LLC 1330 Kinnear Road, Suite 200 Columbus, OH 43212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Jed 2903 Little Darby Road London, Ohio 43140 / US | 02 /
GROEHL, Tyler 4151 Heybridge Avenue Hilliard, Ohio 43026 / US | 03 /
OHST, Devan 1441 Chesapeake Avenue Columbus, Ohio 43212 / US | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | 01 /
JOHNSON, Jed 2903 Little Darby Road London, Ohio 43140 / US | ||
02 /
GROEHL, Tyler 828 W. Lane Avenue Columbus, Ohio 43201 / US | |||
03 /
OHST, Devan 1441 Chesapeake Avenue Columbus, Ohio 43212 / US | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/29] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16845299.3 | 12.09.2016 | [2018/29] | WO2016US51393 | Priority number, date | US201562216553P | 10.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562216553 P | US201662324629P | 19.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662324629 P | [2018/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017044982 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346947 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F2/02, A61F2/06, A61F2/28, A61F2/82, A61K9/70, A61L27/00, A61B17/12, D01F6/58, A61B17/00, A61B90/00, D01D5/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/12113 (EP,US);
A61B17/1214 (EP,US);
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
D01F6/58 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00898 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00942 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12063 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12068 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | A61F2/00, A61F2/02, A61F2/06, A61F2/28, A61F2/82, A61K9/70, A61L27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | POLYMERELEKTROGESPONNENE EMBOLISATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/23] | English: | POLYMERIC ELECTROSPUN EMBOLIZATION DEVICE | [2022/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMBOLISATION ÉLECTROFILÉ POLYMÈRE | [2022/47] |
Former [2018/29] | POLYMERELEKTROGESPONNENE EMBOLISATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2018/29] | POLYMERIC ELECTROSPUN EMBOLIZATION DEVICE AND METHODS OF USE | ||
Former [2018/29] | DISPOSITIF D'EMBOLISATION ÉLECTOFILÉ POLYMÈRE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 23.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006229668 (PRESTEZOG ANNA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0162] *; | [A]US2010070020 (HASHI CRAIG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,4-7B * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0138] *; | [XA]US2014079758 (HALL JOHN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10,13 * figures 2,4 * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0161] * [A] 2,4-6,8,9,11,12; | [A]WO2014140325 (NAT UNIV IRELAND [IE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 201 * * page 21, lines 11-15 * * page 40, lines 14-15 ** page 62, lines 21-27 * | International search | [XY]US2004098023 (LEE ELAINE [US], et al) [X] 1, 12, 15-17 * entire document * [Y] 46; | [A]US2005177103 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA], et al) [A] 1-51* entire document *; | [A]US2007207179 (ANDERSEN ERIK [DK], et al) [A] 1-51 * entire document *; | [A]US2009018643 (HASHI CRAIG [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * entire document *; | [X]US2013310914 (EHRENREICH KEVIN J [US], et al) [X] 1, 21-27, 29, 34, 35, 37, 38, 41, 42 * entire document *; | [X]US2014081414 (HALL JOHN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1, 10, 11, 43, 47-51 * entire document *; | [X]US2014141152 (SOSTEK RON [US], et al) [X] 29-33 * entire document *; | [XY]WO2015100238 (NEOGRAFT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-10, 13, 14, 18-20, 28-30, 43-45 * entire document * [Y] 46 | by applicant | US2015173772 |