blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3362098 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3362098



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 262
09.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.04.2019 General authorisation Search / examination 2
09.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.04.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.04.2019 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
01.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 14
01.03.2019 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
01.03.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.02.2019 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.12.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.12.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
05.12.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
05.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
28.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
28.11.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
28.11.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.06.2018 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 6
22.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.06.2018 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
28.05.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
24.05.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.05.2018 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
30.04.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
16.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.02.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
06.07.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.07.2017 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
02.06.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
10.05.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
20.04.2017 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
27.03.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.03.2017 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 9
20.03.2017 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.03.2017 Claims International Searching Authority 2
20.03.2017 Description International Searching Authority 17
20.03.2017 Drawings International Searching Authority 1
20.03.2017 Translated claims for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 2
20.03.2017 Translated description for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 14
20.03.2017 Translated drawings for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 1
20.03.2017 Translation of the abstract for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 1
29.11.2016 Translated claims for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 2
29.11.2016 Translated description for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 14
29.11.2016 Translated drawings for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 1
29.11.2016 Translation of the abstract for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 1