blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3362098


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Change - representative
24.05.2019 Change - applicant
24.05.2019 Change - inventor
24.05.2019 Change - applicant published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
24.05.2019 Change - inventor published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.12.2018 Amendment by applicant
05.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
20.07.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
20.07.2018 Request for examination filed published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
18.05.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
18.05.2018 New entry: Fee payment for validation state
18.05.2018 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
09.05.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
20.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
19.04.2018 Change - representative
19.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
19.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
05.05.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
21.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication