blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3362098
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018291366Global Dossier 11.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015
WO2016SK60002 12.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20180084748Global Dossier 25.07.2018A
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015
WO2016SK60002 12.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2018534945Global Dossier 29.11.2018A
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015
WO2016SK60002 12.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3001994Global Dossier 20.04.2017A1
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015
WO2016SK60002 12.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3362098Global Dossier 22.08.2018A2
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015
WO2016SK60002 12.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2016336851 07.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015
WO2016SK60002 12.10.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017065696Global Dossier 06.07.2017A3
WO2017065696 20.04.2017A2
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SK500652015 03.05.2017A3
Priority number Date
SK500652015 15.10.2015