Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3362098

EP3362098 - A METHOD FOR ALTERING THE FUNCTIONAL STATE OF MRNA ALLOWING ITS SELECTIVE AND SPECIFIC RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
20.07.2018The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
20.07.2018Request for examination filedpublished on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ústav Polymérov Sav
Dúbravská cesta 9
842 36 Bratislava / SK
[2018/34]
Inventor(s)01 / RÁZGA, Filip
Sokolská 15
90301 Senec / SK
02 / NÉMETHOVÁ, Veronika
Vajanského 7
94001 Nové Zámky / SK
 [2018/34]
Representative(s)Cechvalova, Dagmar
inventa
Patent & Trademark Agency
Palisady 50
811 06 Bratislava / SK
[2018/34]
Application number, filing date16845348.812.10.2016
[2018/34]
WO2016SK60002
Priority number, dateSK2015005006515.10.2015         Original published format: SK 500652015
[2018/34]
Filing languageSK
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017065696
Date:20.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3362098
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/50
[2018/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
Extension statesBA15.05.2018
ME15.05.2018
Validation statesMA15.05.2018
MD15.05.2018
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DES FUNKTIONSZUSTANDES VON MRNA FÜR SELEKTIVE UND SPEZIFISCHE ERKENNUNG[2018/34]
English:A METHOD FOR ALTERING THE FUNCTIONAL STATE OF MRNA ALLOWING ITS SELECTIVE AND SPECIFIC RECOGNITION[2018/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER L'ÉTAT FONCTIONNEL DE L'ARNM POUR PERMETTRE SA RECONNAISSANCE SÉLECTIVE ET SPÉCIFIQUE[2018/34]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2018National basic fee paid 
15.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011065777  (HEIDENREICH OLAF [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * example 2 * [I] 5-7;
 [XI]  - ROMESH R. SUBRAMANIAN ET AL, "Enhancing antisense efficacy with multimers and multi-targeting oligonucleotides (MTOs) using cleavable linkers", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20151007), vol. 43, no. 19, doi:10.1093/nar/gkv992, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 9123 - 9132, XP055254447 [X] 1,5,6,9-12 * page 9126 - page 9129; figures 1,4; table 1 * [I] 2-4,7,8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkv992