Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3351324

EP3351324 - PRECIOUS METAL POWDER PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tanaka Kikinzoku Kogyo K.K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6422 / JP
[2018/30]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAZAKI Takahisa
c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K.
Shonan Plant
2-14 Nagatoro
Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0021 / JP
02 / NAGAOKA Akio
c/o TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K.
Shonan Plant
2-14 Nagatoro
Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0021 / JP
 [2018/30]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[2019/45]
Former [2018/30]Peguet, Wilfried
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date16846413.912.09.2016
[2018/30]
WO2016JP76777
Priority number, dateJP2015018523118.09.2015         Original published format: JP 2015185231
[2018/30]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017047542
Date:23.03.2017
Language:JA
[2017/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3351324
Date:25.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3351324
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:B22F1/00, B22F9/24, C22C1/04, C22C5/00, C22C5/02, C22C5/04, // H01B1/02
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/17]B22F1/00, B22F9/24, C22C1/04, // H01B1/02
Former International [2018/43]B22F9/24, B22F1/00, C22C1/04
Former International [2018/30]B22F9/24, B22F1/00, H01B13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EDELMETALLPULVERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2018/30]
English:PRECIOUS METAL POWDER PRODUCTION METHOD[2018/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POUDRE DE MÉTAL PRÉCIEUX[2018/30]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2018Translation filed 
12.03.2018National basic fee paid 
12.03.2018Search fee paid 
12.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/30]
12.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2019Fee for grant paid
27.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP2006199982  (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND) [AD] 1-7 * claims 1-6 * * examples 1,2 *;
 [AD]JPH10102103  (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND) [AD] 1-7 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2010279116  (IRIZARRY ROBERTO [US]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-9 *;
 [A]CN101823691  (UNIV NINGBO) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-6 *
International search[A]JPH10102109  (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH10183208  (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2006199982  (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008095174  (KOJIMA KAGAKU YAKUHIN KK) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2013202909  (BYUN YOUNG CHANG [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * , & KR 10-2013-0090803 A *