blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3355433

EP3355433 - IGBT SHORT-CIRCUIT DETECTION AND PROTECTION CIRCUIT AND IGBT-BASED CONTROLLABLE RECTIFIER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Controls Technology Company
5757 North Green Bay Avenue
Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US
For all designated states
Johnson Controls Air Conditioning And Refrigeration Company (Wuxi) Co., Ltd
No. 22 National High-Tech
Investment & Development Zone D
Wuxi, Jiangsu 214000 / CN
For all designated states
York (Wuxi) Air Conditioning And Refrigeration Co., Ltd.
No.32 Changjiang Road
Hi-Tech Development Zone
Wuxi, Jiangsu 214028 / CN
[2018/31]
Inventor(s)01 / MIAO, Yu
No.32 Changjiang Road
Hi-Tech Development Zone
Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN
02 / XIE, Yongquan
No.32 Changjiang Road
Hi-Tech Development Zone
Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN
03 / LI, Chengzhi
No.32 Changjiang Road
Hi-Tech Development Zone
Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN
04 / SHAO, Guobin
No.32 Changjiang Road
Hi-Tech Development Zone
Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN
 [2018/31]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole, et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/31]Trinks, Ole
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date16847782.621.04.2016
[2018/31]
WO2016CN79835
Priority number, dateCN201520755608U25.09.2015         Original published format: CN 201520755608 U
[2018/31]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017049900
Date:30.03.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3355433
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:H02H7/20, H03K17/08, H02M1/32, H02H7/12, H02H3/20, H03K17/082
[2019/25]
CPC:
H03K17/0828 (EP,US); H02H7/1213 (KR); H02H7/1257 (US);
H02H7/205 (KR); H02M1/32 (EP,US); H02M3/155 (KR);
H02M7/217 (US); H02H7/1225 (EP,US); H02H7/222 (EP,US);
H03K2217/0009 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/31]H02H7/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/31]
TitleGerman:IGBT-KURZSCHLUSS-DETEKTIONS- UND SCHUTZSCHALTUNG UND IGBT-BASIERTE STEUERBARE GLEICHRICHTERSCHALTUNG[2018/31]
English:IGBT SHORT-CIRCUIT DETECTION AND PROTECTION CIRCUIT AND IGBT-BASED CONTROLLABLE RECTIFIER CIRCUIT[2018/31]
French:CIRCUIT DE DÉTECTION ET DE PROTECTION DE COURT-CIRCUIT D'IGBT ET CIRCUIT REDRESSEUR COMMANDÉ À BASE D'IGBT[2018/31]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2018Translation filed 
23.03.2018National basic fee paid 
23.03.2018Search fee paid 
23.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/31]
23.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/33]
24.01.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201803   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2018
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US4429339  (JAESCHKE JAMES R [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [XI]US4620258  (BLOOMER MILTON D [US]) [X] 1,4 * columns 1-4; figures 1,2b * [I] 2,3,5-10;
 [A]DE19622679  (LEGRAND LIMOGES [FR], et al) [A] 1-10;
 [A]DE10014641  (SIEMENS AG [DE])[A] 1-10;
 [I]US2003042939  (KATO SHUJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [I]US6549438  (MALONE DOUGLAS J [US]) [I] 7-10 * the whole document *;
 [XI]US2004066594  (GONTHIER LAURENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0003] - [0015]; figures 1A,B, 2 * [I] 3-10
International search[X]JP2004222367  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3 * description, paragraphs [0013]-[0062], and figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2004252432  (SASAKI MASATAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *;
 [X]CN102332705  (HANGZHOU RIDING CONTROL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * description, paragraphs [0020]-[0027], and figures 1 and 2 *;
 [A]CN103973277  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN204536486U  (HUNAN CSR TIMES ELECTRIC VEHICLE CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [PX]CN204967246U  (JOHNSON CONTROLS AIR-CONDITIONER AND REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT (WUXI) CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.