blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3354132

EP3354132 - INSECT TRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.04.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.12.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seoul Viosys Co. Ltd.
65-16, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR
[2018/31]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Chung Hoon
65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR
02 / HAN, Kyu Won
65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR
03 / CHANG, Sang Hyun
65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil
Danwon-gu
Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 15429 / KR
 [2018/31]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2022/19]
Former [2018/31]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date16848818.730.08.2016
[2018/31]
WO2016KR09650
Priority number, dateKR2015013676225.09.2015         Original published format: KR 20150136762
[2018/31]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017052092
Date:30.03.2017
Language:KO
[2017/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3354132
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3354132
Date:18.05.2022
Language:EN
[2022/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:A01M1/08, A01M1/04, A01M1/10, F21V19/00, F21V23/00, F21V17/10, F21K99/00, F21V33/00
[2019/25]
CPC:
A01M1/04 (EP,US); A01M1/08 (EP,US); A01M1/106 (EP,US);
F21K99/00 (EP,US); F21V17/10 (EP,US); F21V19/00 (EP,US);
F21V19/0085 (US); F21V23/00 (EP,US); F21V23/001 (US);
F21V23/06 (US); F21V33/00 (EP,US); F21Y2115/10 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2018/31]A01M1/04, F21V19/00, F21V23/00, F21V17/10, F21K99/00, F21V33/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INSEKTENFALLE[2018/31]
English:INSECT TRAP[2018/31]
French:PIÈGE À INSECTES[2018/31]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2018Translation filed 
23.04.2018National basic fee paid 
23.04.2018Search fee paid 
23.04.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/31]
23.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2022Fee for grant paid
12.04.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.02.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.08.2016
CY11.05.2022
AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
IT18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IE30.08.2022
LU30.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
[2024/21]
Former [2024/18]HU30.08.2016
AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
IT18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IE30.08.2022
LU30.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2024/11]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
IT18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IE30.08.2022
LU30.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/42]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IE30.08.2022
LU30.08.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/33]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IE30.08.2022
LU30.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/25]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SI18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
LU30.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/21]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
LU30.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/17]AL18.05.2022
AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/16]AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
MC18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/09]AT18.05.2022
CZ18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
EE18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RO18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
SK18.05.2022
SM18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2023/07]AT18.05.2022
DK18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/51]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
IS18.09.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/50]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
PL18.05.2022
RS18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/49]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
HR18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
LV18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
BG18.08.2022
NO18.08.2022
GR19.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/48]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
NL18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
NO18.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Former [2022/47]AT18.05.2022
ES18.05.2022
FI18.05.2022
LT18.05.2022
SE18.05.2022
NO18.08.2022
PT19.09.2022
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008106900  (CHANG WOONG-JAE [KR], et al) [Y] 2-5 * page 4, paragraphs 51,52,58,60,61 * * page 5, paragraphs 63,64,65,66,67 * * page 6, paragraph 85 - page 7, paragraph 91 ** figures 1-11 *;
 [YA]TWM333509U  (GUANG TAYI CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 1-4,8,9,16-18 * page 6, lines 18-26 * * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 7 * * figure - * [A] 5-7,10-15;
 [Y]KR20090009373  (PARK WOO HYUN [KR]) [Y] 1-5,8,9,15-18 * pages 5-6, paragraphs 28,29 * * figure - *;
 [YA]EP2587115  (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,15-18 * column 5, paragraph 27 - column 6, paragraph 30 * * column 7, paragraph 35 * * column 11, paragraph 56 - column 13, paragraph 66 * * figures 1,2,3,4,7A,7B,8A,8B,,10A,11 * [A] 3-7,9-14;
 [YA]US2014137462  (ROCHA JUAN J [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,9,15-18 * page 2, paragraph 27 * * page 3, paragraph 41 * * page 4, paragraphs 50,51,52,56 * * figure 2 * [A] 6,7,10-14
International search[A]JP2008117772  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-16* See claims 1, 2 and figures 1-3. *;
 [YA]KR20090009373  (PARK WOO HYUN [KR]) [Y] 1, 16 * See abstract, paragraph [29] and figures 1, 2, 4b. * [A] 2-15;
 [Y]JP2009043447  (SHARP KK) [Y] 1, 16 * See paragraphs [0032], [0034], [0069], [0075] and figures 1, 2. *;
 [A]JP2012015012  (IDEC CORP) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0028], claims 1, 2 and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]KR20120078220  (ANT21 CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See abstract, claims 1, 2 and figures 1-3. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.