blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3354377

EP3354377 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.03.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Obschestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennostyu Adirut
Territory of the Innovation Center "Skolkovo"
Ul. Nobelya 7 Etazh 2 Pom. 56
Moscow 143026 / RU
[2018/31]
Inventor(s)01 / VOLKOV, Anatoly Evgenievich
ul. Uralskaya 8 - 48
Sverdlovskaya obl. Nizhnaya Salda 624740 / RU
 [2018/31]
Representative(s)Chimini, Francesco
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza della Vittoria 11
25122 Brescia / IT
[2018/31]
Application number, filing date16849092.808.09.2016
[2018/31]
WO2016RU00616
Priority number, dateRU2015014105225.09.2015         Original published format: RU 2015141052
[2018/31]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017052417
Date:30.03.2017
Language:RU
[2017/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3354377
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3354377
Date:08.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU30.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:B22F3/105, B33Y30/00, B33Y10/00, B23K26/342, B23K15/00
[2020/02]
CPC:
B33Y10/00 (EP,RU,US); B22F3/105 (RU); B23K26/342 (EP,US);
B22F10/25 (EP,RU,US); B22F12/90 (EP,RU,US); B23K15/0086 (EP,US);
B23K26/1464 (US); B29C64/153 (US); B29C64/188 (US);
B29C64/329 (US); B33Y30/00 (EP,RU,US); B22F2999/00 (EP,RU,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/31]B22F3/105, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG VON KOMPONENTEN[2018/31]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING OF COMPONENTS[2018/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'ARTICLES[2018/31]
Entry into regional phase16.04.2017Translation filed 
20.03.2018National basic fee paid 
20.03.2018Search fee paid 
20.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/31]
20.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2020Fee for grant paid
22.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.02.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.01.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.09.2016
AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CY08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
MC08.04.2020
MK08.04.2020
MT08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
TR08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
GB08.09.2020
IE08.09.2020
LU08.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/28]HU08.09.2016
AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CY08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
MC08.04.2020
MT08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
TR08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
GB08.09.2020
IE08.09.2020
LU08.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2022/27]HU08.09.2016
AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CY08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
MT08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
TR08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
GB08.09.2020
IE08.09.2020
LU08.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2021/38]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
GB08.09.2020
IE08.09.2020
LU08.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2021/37]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
IE08.09.2020
LU08.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
Former [2021/36]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
LU08.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
Former [2021/35]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
LU08.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
Former [2021/27]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
LU08.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SI08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2021/10]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
PL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SK08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2021/09]AL08.04.2020
AT08.04.2020
CZ08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
EE08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
IT08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2021/08]AL08.04.2020
DK08.04.2020
ES08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
RO08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
SM08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2021/04]AL08.04.2020
FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2021/01]FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
BG08.07.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2020/51]FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
RS08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2020/50]FI08.04.2020
HR08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
LV08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
NO08.07.2020
GR09.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2020/48]FI08.04.2020
LT08.04.2020
NL08.04.2020
SE08.04.2020
NO08.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
PT17.08.2020
Former [2020/47]LT08.04.2020
NO08.07.2020
IS08.08.2020
Former [2020/46]IS08.08.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]US6149072  (TSENG AMPERE A [US]) [A] 1-15* figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2005288813  (YANG LAIXIA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2011240607  (STECKER SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]  - STEFFEN NOWOTNY ET AL, "Laser Beam Build-Up Welding: Precision in Repair, Surface Cladding, and Direct 3D Metal Deposition", JOURNAL OF THERMAL SPRAY TECHNOLOGY., US, (20070424), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s11666-007-9028-5, ISSN 1059-9630, pages 344 - 348, XP055584862 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11666-007-9028-5
International search[Y]SU779441  (INST MEKHANIKI METALLOPOLIMERN [SU]) [Y] 7, 12, 21, 24 * , the claims, fig.1, col.4, lines 32-35 *;
 [Y]RU2132761  (JUNAJTID TEKNOLODZHIZ KOPEHREJ [US]) [Y] 6* , item 1 of the claims *;
 [Y]US6149072  (TSENG AMPERE A [US]) [Y] 1-7, 11-12, 15-17, 20-25 * , the abstract, fig.1 *;
 [YA]RU2228243  (MAZUMDER DZHIOTI) [Y] 1-7, 11-12, 15-17, 20-25 * , the claims, p. 1, paragraphs 1 and 6; p.7, lines 20-25 * [A] 8-10, 13-14, 18-19;
 [Y]WO2005089090  (UNIV NORTH DAKOTA [US], et al) [Y] 1-7, 11-12, 15-17, 22-25 * , the abstract, fig. *;
 [Y]RU139624U  (OBSCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOI OTVETSTVENNOSTIU ''NANOTEKHNOLOGII PROVODNI) [Y] 2 * , p.6, lines 7-17 *;
 [Y]  - ZLENKO M.A. et al., Additivnye tekhnologii v mashinostroenii, St. Petersburg, (20130000), page 58, 133, XP009510061 [Y] 6, 15-16
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.