Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3357896

EP3357896 - CERAMIC BONDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2018/32]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAMURA, Kiyotaka
c/o Kyocera Corporation
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
02 / MORIYAMA, Masayuki
c/o Kyocera Corporation
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
 [2019/14]
Former [2018/32]01 / NAKAMURA, Kiyotaka
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
02 / MORIYAMA, Masayuki
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2018/32]
Application number, filing date16851641.728.09.2016
[2018/32]
WO2016JP78641
Priority number, dateJP2015019153629.09.2015         Original published format: JP 2015191536
[2018/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017057470
Date:06.04.2017
Language:JA
[2017/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3357896
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3357896
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.04.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/565, C04B37/00
[2019/19]
Former International [2018/32]C04B37/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KERAMISCHER VERBUNDKÖRPER[2019/19]
English:CERAMIC BONDED BODY[2018/32]
French:CORPS JOINT EN CÉRAMIQUE[2019/19]
Former [2018/32]KERAMISCHER GEBONDETER KÖRPER
Former [2018/32]CORPS EN CÉRAMIQUE LIÉ
Entry into regional phase23.03.2018Translation filed 
23.03.2018National basic fee paid 
23.03.2018Search fee paid 
23.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/32]
23.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2019Fee for grant paid
15.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]FR2806405  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-5 * claim 1 * * claim 3 * * page 27, line 19 * [I] 6
International search[XYA]JP2014198650  (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [X] 1-2 * , claims; examples 1, 14 & US 2014/0296055 A1 claims; examples 1, 14 & EP 2784050 A2 * [Y] 3-4 [A] 5-6;
 [YA]WO2014133068  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-4 * , claims; paragraphs [0030] to [0031] & US 2016/0001526 A1 claims; paragraphs [0034] to [0035] & EP 2963002 A1 * [A] 5-6;
 [A]JP2013522154  (Commissariat a l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives) [A] 5-6 * , claims; example 5 & US 2013/0064602 A1 claims; example 5 & WO 2011/113760 A1 & FR 2957544 A & CA 2793121 A & CN 103003018 A & KR 10-2013-0060174 A *