EP3358072 - PITCH-BASED ULTRAFINE CARBON FIBERS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE USING SAID PITCH-BASED ULTRAFINE CARBON FIBERS, AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING SAID NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Limited 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [2019/31] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Teijin Limited 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | ||
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Teijin Limited 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAKAWA, Ryota c/o Teijin Limited 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5300005 / JP | 02 /
YACHI, Kazuki c/o Teijin Limited 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5300005 / JP | 03 /
KANEMATSU, Asami c/o Teijin Limited 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5300005 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851698.7 | 28.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP78745 | Priority number, date | JP20150192914 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015192914 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057527 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358072 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3358072 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06M11/34, D01F9/145, H01M4/13, H01M4/62, D06M101/40, D06M11/58 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
D01F9/145 (EP,KR,US);
D06M11/34 (KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H01M4/133 (US);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | D06M11/34, D01F9/145, H01M4/13, H01M4/62, D06M101/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PECHBASIERTE ULTRAFEINE KOHLENSTOFFFASERN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON, NEGATIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT MIT VERWENDUNG DER BESAGTEN PECHBASIERTEN ULTRAFEINEN KOHLENSTOFFFASERN UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT MIT BESAGTER NEGATIVELEKTRODE FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2018/32] | English: | PITCH-BASED ULTRAFINE CARBON FIBERS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE USING SAID PITCH-BASED ULTRAFINE CARBON FIBERS, AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING SAID NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE | [2018/32] | French: | FIBRES DE CARBONE ULTRAFINES À BASE DE BRAI, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUSE UTILISANT LESDITES FIBRES DE CARBONE ULTRAFINES À BASE DE BRAI, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUSE AYANT LADITE ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUSE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2018 | Translation filed | 30.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 30.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | IE | 28.09.2019 | LU | 28.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05302215 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-7 * examples 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] *; | [A]US6156457 (TAKAMI NORIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * claim 1 * * example 3 * * column 3, lines 26-37 * * column 6, lines 39-48 *; | [A]JP2005097792 (KURARAY CO, et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0007] * * example 3 * * table 1 *; | [A]KR20110072917 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * claims 1,4,7,11-14 * * paragraph [0018] * * figure 2a *; | [AD]WO2014115852 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AP]EP2950375 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] * * examples C1-C6 * * table C1 * * paragraphs [0171] , [0239] , [0410] - [0423] *; | [A] - WENTIAN GU ET AL, "Review of nanostructured carbon materials for electrochemical capacitor applications: advantages and limitations of activated carbon, carbide-derived carbon, zeolite-templated carbon, carbon aerogels, carbon nanotubes, onion-like carbon, and graphene", WILEY INTERDISCIPLINARY REVIEWS: ENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT, (20131206), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1002/wene.102, ISSN 2041-8396, pages 424 - 473, XP055151432 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/wene.102 | International search | [A]JPH05156522 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-7* , claims; example 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010111990 (UNIV OITA) [A] 1-7 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013108186 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-7 * , example 1; paragraph [0018] (Family: none) * |