EP3359169 - DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE BASED ON IDENTIFICATION AND AMELIORATION OF LIVER DYSFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORIG3N, INC. 27 Drydock Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLICKSMAN, Marcie, A. 757 East 5th Street Boston, MA 02127 / US | 02 /
ZAIDI, Nikhat, F. 44 Walter Street Newton, MA 02459 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Robin, Y. 6 Sentry Hill Place Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16854189.4 | 05.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016US55411 | Priority number, date | US201562237248P | 05.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562237248 P | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017062401 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3359169 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/407, A61K35/545, C12N5/071, C12N5/074 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
A61K35/407 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/067 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/15 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/33 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P25/16 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (KR,US);
G01N33/5038 (US);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
C12N2501/12 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2506/115 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/158 (KR);
G01N2333/4703 (KR);
G01N2333/77 (KR);
G01N2333/90241 (KR);
G01N2800/2835 (US);
G01N2800/52 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS PARKINSON AUF DER GRUNDLAGE DER IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND LINDERUNG VON LEBERFUNKTIONSSTÖRUNGEN | [2018/33] | English: | DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE BASED ON IDENTIFICATION AND AMELIORATION OF LIVER DYSFUNCTION | [2018/33] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC ET TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON BASÉS SUR L'IDENTIFICATION ET L'AMÉLIORATION D'UN DYSFONCTIONNEMENT HÉPATIQUE | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 02.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2020 | 31.10.2020 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2021 | 31.10.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02064748 (FURCHT LEO T [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. pages 1,64-65,claims 1,24 *; | [XY]US2010314251 (GOLDKNOPF IRA LEONARD [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9 * whole document esp. paragraph [16], claims 1,4 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO2014124527 (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15* whole document esp. paragraph [2], claim 1 *; | [Y]US2014249209 (FOX IRA JACOB [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. paragraphs [4,85] *; | [Y] - LILAH TOKER ET AL, "Metaanalysis of flawed expression profiling data leading to erroneous Parkinson's biomarker identification", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, US, (20150714), vol. 112, no. 28, doi:10.1073/pnas.1507563112, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E3637 - E3637, XP055548090 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1507563112 | [Y] - JOSE A. SANTIAGO ET AL, "Reply to Toker and Pavlidis: Blood biomarkers for Parkinson's disease", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, US, (20150714), vol. 112, no. 28, doi:10.1073/pnas.1508415112, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E3638 - E3638, XP055548095 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1508415112 | [Y] - JOSE A. SANTIAGO ET AL, "Network-based metaanalysis identifies HNF4A and PTBP1 as longitudinally dynamic biomarkers for Parkinson's disease", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, US, (20150217), vol. 112, no. 7, doi:10.1073/pnas.1423573112, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2257 - 2262, XP055548100 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1423573112 | [Y] - BURGESS JB, BAENZIGER J U AND BROWN WR, "Abnormal surface distribution of the human asialoglycoprotein receptor in cirrhosis", HEPATOLOGY, (19921231), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 702 - 706, XP009510779 [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. pages 702,705 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.1840150425 | [Y] - J.-K. LAI ET AL, "Kruppel-like factor 4 is involved in cell scattering induced by hepatocyte growth factor", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, GB, (20121015), vol. 125, no. 20, doi:10.1242/jcs.108910, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 4853 - 4864, XP055548650 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.108910 | [YP] - Zhi-Xu He, "Impact of physiological, pathological and environmental factors on the expression and activity of human cytochrome P450 2D6 and implications in precision medicine", (20151116), URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/26574146, (20190129), XP055548600 [YP] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/03602532.2015.1101131 | International search | [XY]WO9527512 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [X] 25-26 * ; page 57, lines 12.24: claims 20-21 * [Y] 27/25-26; | [Y]US2010129440 (ZHAO YONG [US], et al) [Y] 4/3/1-2 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0009], [0011], [0085] *; | [Y]US2011097378 (BADYLAK STEPHEN F [US]) [Y] 9/1-2 * ; paragraph [0039] *; | [Y]US2014087416 (SIMEONOV KAMEN P [US], et al) [Y] 3/1-2, 4/3/1-2, 5/3/1-2, 6/3/1-2, 16-17, 18/16-17, 19/16-17, 20/19/16-1727/25-26 * ; paragraphs [0128], [0236] *; | [Y]WO2014085830 (PARKINSON S INST [GB], et al) [Y] 20/19/16-17* ; paragraph [0026] *; | [XY]US2014302068 (KHOO SOK KEAN [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 8/1-2 * ; paragraphs [0008], [0012], [0013], [0033], [0068], [0122], [0123]; claim 29 * [Y] 3/1-2, 4/3/1-2, 5/3/1-2, 6/3/1-2, 9/1-2, 16-17, 18/16-17,19/16-17, 20/19/16-17 | by applicant | WO02064748 | WO2007069666 | US2010314251 | WO2011074690 | US2011223669 | US2012190059 | WO2012105505 | US2013065311 | WO2014124527 | US2014249209 | WO2015003643 | - K. TAKAHASHIS. YAMANAKA, Cell, (20060000), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - K. TAKAHASHI et al., Cell, (20070000), vol. 131, pages 861 - 872 | - J. YU et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 318, pages 1917 - 1920 | - M. NAKAGAWA et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20080000), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 795 - 797 | - Science, (20080000), vol. 322, pages 949 - 953 | - Proc. Jpn. Acad. Ser. B. Phys. Biol. Sci., (20090000), vol. 85, pages 348 - 62 | - Cell Stem Cell, (20080000), vol. 3, pages 132 - 135 | - Nat Methods, (20090000), vol. 6, pages 805 - 8 | - PloS Biology, (20080000), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 2237 - 2247 | - R. L. JUDSON et al., Nat. Biotech, (20090000), vol. 27, pages 459 - 461 | - RAMBHATLA et al., Cell Transplant, (20030000), vol. 12, pages 1 - 11 | - CAI et al., Hepatology, (20070000), vol. 45, no. 5, pages 1229 - 39 |