Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3359675

EP3359675 - ACTIVATION OF IMMUNE-RELATED SIGNALLING PATHWAYS IN CELLS VIA OPTOFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nant Holdings IP, LLC
9920 Jefferson Boulevard
Culver City, CA 90232 / US
[N/P]
Former [2018/33]For all designated states
Nant Holdings IP, LLC
9920 Jefferson Boulevard
Culver City, California 90232 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Ting
9920 Jefferson Boulevard
Culver City, California 90232 / US
02 / NIAZI, Kayvan
9920 Jefferson Boulevard
Culver City, California 90232 / US
 [2018/33]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/33]LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date16854471.607.10.2016
[2018/33]
WO2016US56097
Priority number, dateUS201562238652P07.10.2015         Original published format: US 201562238652 P
[2018/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017062838
Date:13.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3359675
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017
[2018/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.04.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/87, C12N13/00, C12M1/42, A61K9/51, A61K35/12
[2018/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
TitleGerman:AKTIVIERUNG VON IMMUNVERWANDTEN SIGNALWEGEN IN ZELLEN MITTELS OPTOFEKTION[2018/33]
English:ACTIVATION OF IMMUNE-RELATED SIGNALLING PATHWAYS IN CELLS VIA OPTOFECTION[2018/33]
French:ACTIVATION DES VOIES DE SIGNALISATION IMMUNITAIRES DANS DES CELLULES PAR OPTOINFECTION[2018/33]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2018National basic fee paid 
07.05.2018Search fee paid 
07.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/33]
28.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - EKATERINA Y LUKIANOVA-HLEB ET AL, "Plasmonic nanobubble-enhanced endosomal escape processes for selective and guided intracellular delivery of chemotherapy to drug-resistant cancer cells", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 33, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2011.11.015, ISSN 0142-9612, (20111110), pages 1821 - 1826, (20111115), XP028341219 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1822, column r - page 1823, column l, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2011.11.015
 [Y]  - LUKIANOVA-HLEB EKATERINA Y ET AL, "Plasmonic nanobubbles for target cell-specific gene and drug delivery and multifunctional processing of heterogeneous cell systems", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2004 - 20-1-2004; SAN JOSE,, (20140307), vol. 8972, doi:10.1117/12.2039851, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 897206 - 897206, XP060034536 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2039851
 [Y]  - EKATERINA Y LUKIANOVA-HLEB ET AL, "Cell-specific transmembrane injection of molecular cargo with gold nanoparticle-generated transient plasmonic nanobubbles", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 33, no. 21, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2012.03.077, ISSN 0142-9612, (20120326), pages 5441 - 5450, (20120329), XP028487153 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5442, column r, paragraph 3 - page 5443, column r, paragraph 4 * * Section 3.3. Gene transfer into human T cells with flow system *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2012.03.077
 [A]  - H. LEMOS ET AL, "Activation of the STING Adaptor Attenuates Experimental Autoimmune Encephalitis", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20140505), vol. 192, no. 12, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1303258, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 5571 - 5578, XP055497014 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1303258
International search[Y]US2013039933  (BARBER GLEN N [US]) [Y] 1-9, 11-20 * See abstract; claim 1; paragraphs [0198], [0230], [0417]. *;
 [Y]  - HEINEMANN et al., "Delivery of proteins to mammalian cells via gold nanoparticle mediated laser transfection", Nanotechnology, (20140000), vol. 25, no. 24, pages 1 - 9, XP020266136 [Y] 1-9, 11-20 * See abstract; pages 2-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/25/24/245101
 [A]  - PAVOT et al., "Encapsulation of Nod1 and Nod2 receptor ligands into poly (lactic acid) nanoparticles potentiates their immune properties", Journal of Controlled Release, (20130000), vol. 167, pages 60 - 67, XP029003997 [A] 1-9, 11-20 * See pages 60, 62. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2013.01.015
 [A]  - HANSON et al., "Nanoparticulate STING agonists are potent lymph node-targe ted vaccine adjuvants", The Journal of Clinical Investigation, (20150600), vol. 125, no. 6, pages 2532 - 2546, XP055372719 [A] 1-9, 11-20 * See the whole document. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI79915
 [A]  - DAHIYA et al., "Nod2 downregulates TLR2/1 mediated ILlbeta gene expression in mouse peritoneal macrophages", PloS One, (20110000), vol. 6, no. Issue 11, e27828, pages 1 - 11, XP055372734 [A] 1-9, 11-20 * See the whole document. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0027828