Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3363838

EP3363838 - MULTI-COMPONENT COPOLYMER, RUBBER COMPOSITION, CROSSLINKED RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND RUBBER ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/34]
Inventor(s)01 / KIMURA, Madoka
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / OISHI, Shigeki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
03 / TANABE, Tomoe
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/34]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/34]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16855111.711.10.2016
[2018/34]
WO2016JP04538
Priority number, dateJP2015020497116.10.2015         Original published format: JP 2015204971
[2018/34]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017064857
Date:20.04.2017
Language:JA
[2017/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3363838
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.04.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08F297/06, B60C1/00, C08L53/00, C08K3/04, C08L53/02
[2018/36]
Former International [2018/34]C08F297/06, B60C1/00, C08L53/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
TitleGerman:MEHRKOMPONENTIGES COPOLYMER, KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERNETZTE KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND GUMMIARTIKEL[2018/34]
English:MULTI-COMPONENT COPOLYMER, RUBBER COMPOSITION, CROSSLINKED RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND RUBBER ARTICLE[2018/34]
French:COPOLYMÈRE À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES, COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC, COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC RÉTICULÉ, ET ARTICLE EN CAOUTCHOUC[2018/34]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2018Translation filed 
29.03.2018National basic fee paid 
29.03.2018Search fee paid 
29.03.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
29.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB2156368  (CHARBONNAGES STE CHIMIQUE) [X] 1,5-8 * example 2 * [I] 2-4,9-14;
 [A]WO2015023047  (KOREA IND TECH INST [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013281626  (TSE MUN F [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[XA]JPS6112712  (CHARBONNAGES STE CHIMIQUE) [X] 1-4, 6-7, 9-14 * , claims; examples 1, 2 & GB 2156368 A claims; examples 1, 2 & DE 3510624 A & FR 2562079 A & BE 902035 A & CH 662574 A & NL 8500919 A & ES 541366 A & CA 1281451 A1 & IE 58344 B & IT 8547857 A & LU 85818 A & IT 1182724 B & GR 850760 A * [A] 5, 8;
 [A]JP2005511829  (Exxonmobil Chemical Patents Inc.) [A] 1-14 * , & US 2004/0242731 A1 & US 2004/0242795 A1 & WO 2003/050149 A1 & WO 2003/050171 A2 & WO 2003/054032 A1 & DE 60232020 D & CA 2468636 A1 & CN 1602319 A & CN 1602320 A & RU 2004121164 A & AT 428734 T & AU 2002353093 A & TW 200307009 A *;
 [A]JPH07216037  (POLYSAR RUBBER CORP) [A] 1-14 * , & US 5260383 A & US 5362817 A & EP 509357 A1 & DE 69211215 C & DE 69211215 D & CA 2064938 A1 *;
 [A]JP2013507515  (Dynasol Elastomeros, S.A.) [A] 1-14 * , & US 2012/0270991 A1 & WO 2011/045450 A1 & EP 2489688 A1 & TW 201120127 A & CA 2777674 A1 & CN 102612527 A & MX 2012004402 A & RU 2012120253 A *;
 [A]JP2007197556  (KANEKA CORP) [A] 1-14 * , (Family: none) *